This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 08:22:58 (UTC).

LILA vs MAGLAYA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2016 LILA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MAGLAYA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0094

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAHIM LILA

Defendant

DATU EDUARDO S MAGLAYA

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, PAUL A

910 N State Street

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant Attorney

INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICES

1040 Iowa Ave Suite 109

Riverside, CA 92507

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF RAHIM LILA SERVED ON DATU EDUARDO S MAGLAYA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/21/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF RAHIM LILA AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 01/21/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RAHIM LILA.

DECLARATION OF EX PARTE APPLIC

DECLARATION OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF RAHIM LILA REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) RAHIM LILA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY JORN S. ROSSI

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF RAHIM

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF RAHIM LILA IN OPPOSITION TO EXPARTE MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT FILED

ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF

ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF RAHIM LILA BY DATU EDUARDO S MAGLAYA REPRESENTED BY INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICES FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF TRIAL (UNLAW

CLERK'S NOTICE OF TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER).

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF RAHIM LILA REMOVE ATTORNEY JORN S. ROSSI FOR PARTY(S) RAHIM LILA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PAUL A LEVINE

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/02/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS FILED.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/02/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF RAHIM LILA REMOVE ATTORNEY JORN S. ROSSI FOR PARTY(S) RAHIM LILA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PAUL A LEVINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (HEMET) SET; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 02/24/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF RAHIM LILA BY DATU EDUARDO S MAGLAYA REPRESENTED BY INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICES FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF RAHIM LILA SERVED ON DATU EDUARDO S MAGLAYA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/21/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 3/21/16 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less