This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 08:17:20 (UTC).

LIFSCHUTZ VS MEDICAL STAFF

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 LIFSCHUTZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MEDICAL STAFF. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0671

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Appellants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

HARRY LIFSCHUTZ M.D

MEDICAL STAFF OF JOHN F KENNEDY MEMORIAL

DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERINC

RUFUS W GORE MD

AARON BEAN MD

PREMIER SURGICAL ASSOCIATES INC

SON HA YU MD

PREMIER SURGICAL ASSOC. PALM SPRINGS INC

SAMUEL IBRAHIM MD

PUSHPINDER SIVIA MD

JOHN LEE MD

BEN WEHRLI MD

SAMUEL IBRAHIM MD INC

COACHELLA VALLEY FOOT AND ANKLE INSTITUTE

DESERT VEIN & VASCULAR INSTITUTE

DAVID JOHNSON MD

Defendant, Appellant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERINC

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE

550 North Brand Blvd. Suite 1500

Glendale, CA 91203

EANET PC

550 S Hope Street Suite 750

Los Angeles, CA 90071

ARENT FOX LLP

555 West Fifth Street 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Plaintiff, Defendant, Appellant and Respondent Attorneys

EANET PC

550 S Hope Street Suite 750

Los Angeles, CA 90071

ARENT FOX LLP

555 West Fifth Street 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

LATHAM & WATKINS

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GRESHAM SAVAGE NOLAN & TILDEN

3403 Tenth Street Ste 700

Riverside, CA 13641

LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

12670 High Bluff Drive

San Diego, CA 92130-2071

GREER & ASSOCIATESAPC

16855 West Bernardino Dr #255

San Diego, CA 92127

Plaintiff, Respondent, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE

550 North Brand Blvd. Suite 1500

Glendale, CA 91203

EANET PC

550 S Hope Street Suite 750

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GRESHAM SAVAGE NOLAN & TILDEN

3403 Tenth Street Ste 700

Riverside, CA 13641

LATHAM & WATKINS

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GREER & ASSOCIATESAPC

16855 West Bernardino Dr #255

San Diego, CA 92127

Defendant, Appellant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LATHAM & WATKINS

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF (PROPOS

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF (PROPOSED JOINT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BY MEDICAL STAFF OF JOHN F KENNEDYMEMORIAL, RUFUS W GORE MD, PUSHPINDER SIVIA MD, JOHN LEE MD, SAMUEL IBRAHIM MD INC, BEN WEHRLI MD FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERINC

REPLY TO IN SUPP OF ITS MOTION

REPLY TO IN SUPP OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS BY DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERINC FILED

OPPOSITION TO COACHELLA VALLEY

OPPOSITION TO COACHELLA VALLEYS JOINDER IN DEMURRER OF MEDICAL STAFF ET AL BY PLAINTIFF FILED

JOINDER TO DEMURRER OF MEDICAL

JOINDER TO DEMURRER OF MEDICAL STAFF OF JOHN F.KENNEDY FILED BY COACHELLA VALLEY FOOT AND ANKLEINSTITUTE. (GENERAL MOTION/EX-PARTE)

DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HARRY LIFSCHUTZ BY MEDICAL STAFF OF JOHN F KENNEDYMEMORIAL, RUFUS W GORE MD, PUSHPINDER SIVIA MD, JOHN LEE MD, SAMUEL IBRAHIM MD, BEN WEHRLI MD, DAVID JOHNSON MD REPRESENTED BY ARENT FOX LLP FILED.

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION FILED BY SAMUEL IBRAHIM MD INC, PREMIER SURGICAL ASSOCIATES INC, PREMIER SURGICAL ASSOC. PALM SPRINGS INC PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41(A)(2) (FORM CIV-141).

RESPONSE TO PLFFS OBJCTIONS TO

RESPONSE TO PLFFS OBJCTIONS TO RJN I/S OF MTS 2ND AMENDED BY MEDICAL STAFF OF JOHN F KENNEDYMEMORIAL, RUFUS W GORE MD, PUSHPINDER SIVIA MD, JOHN LEE MD, SAMUEL IBRAHIM MD INC, BEN WEHRLI MD, AARON BEAN MD, DAVID JOHNSON MD FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HARRY LIFSCHUTZ M.D

NOTICE OF INTENT OF TELEPHONIC

NOTICE OF INTENT OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF SAMANTHA KOPPEL BY DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERINC FILED.

OPPOSITION TO COACHELLA VALLEY

OPPOSITION TO COACHELLA VALLEY FOOT AND ANKLE INSTITUTE INCS JOINDER TO DEMURRER TO 2ND AMEND COMPL BY PLAINTIFF FILED

DECLARATION OF DEBRA J.ALBIN-R

DECLARATION OF DEBRA J.ALBIN-RILEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MEDICAL STAFF OF JOHN F KENNEDYMEMORIAL, RUFUS W GORE MD, PUSHPINDER SIVIA MD, JOHN LEE MD, SAMUEL IBRAHIM MD, BEN WEHRLI MD, AARON BEAN MD, DAVID JOHNSON MD

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HARRY

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HARRY LIFSCHUTZ FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

OPPOSITION TO /IN PART TO DEFT

OPPOSITION TO /IN PART TO DEFTS APP TO SEAL X-COMP BY ATTORNEY ARENT FOX LLP FOR DEFENDANTS FILED

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF APPLICA

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO SEAL CROSS-COMPLAINT BY DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERINC FILED

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF APPLICAT

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF APPLICATION TO SEAL (UNREDACTED) FILED BY DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERINC. (NOT IMAGED).

CASE IS REASSIGNED TO DEPARTME

CASE IS REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1 FOR LAW AND

232 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL. RECORD DUE ON 08/03/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - NOTICE TO PREPARE SENT TO DCA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: AMENDED NOTIFICATION OF ESTIMATE OF COSTS DUE 07/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 07/14/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: NOTIFICATION OF ESTIMATE OF COSTS DUE 07/09/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SAMUEL IBRAHIM MD INC, PREMIER SURGICAL ASSOCIATES INC, PREMIER SURGICAL ASSOC. PALM SPRINGS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - APPEAL PACKET/DESIGNATIONS/CLERK CERT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - CHECK FOR $775.

    Read MoreRead Less
503 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2019 OF HARRY LIFSCHUTZ SERVED ON COACHELLA VALLEY FOOT AND ANKLEINSTITUTE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/06/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2019 OF HARRY LIFSCHUTZ AS TO BEN WEHRLI MD; MAILING DATE OF 02/19/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE IS REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1 FOR LAW AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket170.6 CCP FILED BY HARRY LIFSCHUTZ M.D AGAINST JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2019 OF HARRY LIFSCHUTZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/26/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less