This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 00:08:30 (UTC).

LESSENGER VS HOTCAKES INC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 LESSENGER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOTCAKES INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1027

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAMMY LESSENGER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

IHOP HOTCAKES INC DBA

IHOP HOTCAKES INC

HOTCAKES INC

LA PAZ LANDSCAPINGDEVELOPMENTINC

MIRAGE PROPERTIES LTD

LA PAZ LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

LA PAZ LANDSCAPINGDEVELOPMENTINC

MIRAGE PROPERTIES LTD

LA PAZ LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY REGAR A PROFESSIONAL LAWCORPORATION

74-900 Highway 111 #223

Indian Wells, CA 92210

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLLINGSHEAD & ASSOCIATES

3880 Atherton Road

Rocklin, CA 95765

LAW OFFICE OF PATRICK J CAMPBELL

3880 Atherton Rd

Rocklin, CA 95765

LAW OFFICES OF MUHAR GARBER AV& DUNCAN

Po Box 51457

Ontario, CA 91764

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MUHAR GARBER AV& DUNCAN

Po Box 51457

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 04/10/20.

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNM

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: JURY TRIAL IS RESCHEDULED TO 05/22/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HOTCAKES INC

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8/30/19.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CROSS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/18/2019 OF HOTCAKES INC AS TO DEFENDANT MIRAGE PROPERTIES LTD FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF TAMMY LESSENGER AS TO DEFENDANT MIRAGE PROPERTIES LTD FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HOTCAKES INC

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY LA PAZ LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY TAMMY LESSENGER.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TAMMY LESSENGER

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/18/2019 OF HOTCAKES INC SERVED ON LA PAZ LANDSCAPINGDEVELOPMENTINC FILED; DATE OF MAILING 06/21/19

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF TAMMY LESSENGER NAMING DOES 3 TO BE MIRAGE PROPERTIES LTD FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/18/2019 OF HOTCAKES INC NAMING ROES/MOES 1 TO BE LA PAZ LANDSCAPINGDEVELOPMENTINC, MIRAGE PROPERTIES LTD FILED

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF TAMMY LESSENGER AND FILED.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingDept: 12; Action text: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CONTINUANCE OF 5/22/20 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION SET ON 5/18/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/18/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF HOTCAKES INC REPRESENTED BY HOLLINGSHEAD & ASSOCIATES FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/18/2019 OF HOTCAKES INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF TAMMY LESSENGER SERVED ON HOTCAKES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/28/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF TAMMY LESSENGER NAMING DOES 1 TO BE HOTCAKES INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/08/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF TAMMY LESSENGER AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less