This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/27/2022 at 04:59:39 (UTC).

ALBRECHT vs COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2015 ALBRECHT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig G. Riemer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1100

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig G. Riemer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SLOVAK BARON EMPEY MURPHY & PINKNEY

FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP SLOVAK BARON EMPEY MURPHY & PINKNEY

 

Court Documents

Remittitur from Court of Appeal AFFIRMED on Appeal Not Specified of LEONARD ALBRECHT

01/05/2022: Remittitur from Court of Appeal AFFIRMED on Appeal Not Specified of LEONARD ALBRECHT

Order from District Court of Appeal Request for publication of the nonpublished opinion filed in the above matter September 1, 2021, is granted on Appeal Not Specified of LEONARD ALBRECHT

09/09/2021: Order from District Court of Appeal Request for publication of the nonpublished opinion filed in the above matter September 1, 2021, is granted on Appeal Not Specified of LEONARD ALBRECHT

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: MOTION ON PRO HAC VICE to appear Pro Hac Vice for LEONARD ALBRECHT by JOSH PETERSON.

03/09/2017: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: MOTION ON PRO HAC VICE to appear Pro Hac Vice for LEONARD ALBRECHT by JOSH PETERSON.

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: MOTION ON PRO HAC VICE to appear Pro Hac Vice for LEONARD ALBRECHT by JOSH PETERSON.

03/06/2017: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: MOTION ON PRO HAC VICE to appear Pro Hac Vice for LEONARD ALBRECHT by JOSH PETERSON.

Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

05/18/2017: Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for Transfer Case and in the alternative Stay Proceedings by COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

11/15/2016: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for Transfer Case and in the alternative Stay Proceedings by COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

01/11/2017: Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: APPL OF AARON J.HARKINS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE to appear Pro Hac Vice for COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE by PLAINTIFFS.

04/23/2015: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: APPL OF AARON J.HARKINS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE to appear Pro Hac Vice for COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE by PLAINTIFFS.

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: APPL ON JEROME A.MIRANOWSKI FOR ADMIN PRO HAC VICE to appear Pro Hac Vice for COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE by PLAINTIFF'S.

04/23/2015: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: APPL ON JEROME A.MIRANOWSKI FOR ADMIN PRO HAC VICE to appear Pro Hac Vice for COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE by PLAINTIFF'S.

Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

08/26/2016: Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

Legacy Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted 07/26/17 RE: OSC Why Cases Should not be Determined Related

09/07/2017: Legacy Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted 07/26/17 RE: OSC Why Cases Should not be Determined Related

Legacy Minute Order: OSC Hearing re: Why Cases Should not be Determined Related and Re-Assigned as to LEONARD ALBRECHT, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

07/26/2017: Legacy Minute Order: OSC Hearing re: Why Cases Should not be Determined Related and Re-Assigned as to LEONARD ALBRECHT, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

10/18/2017: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

10/18/2017: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

12/20/2017: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Status Conference re MSC

03/28/2018: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Status Conference re MSC

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Adjudication on 2nd Amended Complaint of ALBRECHT by LEONARD ALBRECHT

04/11/2018: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Adjudication on 2nd Amended Complaint of ALBRECHT by LEONARD ALBRECHT

Legacy Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re TRIAL CONTINUANCE.

04/18/2018: Legacy Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re TRIAL CONTINUANCE.

376 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Remittitur from Court of Appeal AFFIRMED on Appeal Not Specified of LEONARD ALBRECHT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order from District Court of Appeal Request for publication of the nonpublished opinion filed in the above matter September 1, 2021, is granted on Appeal Not Specified of LEONARD ALBRECHT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021

DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Opinion from Court of Appeal on Appeal Not Specified of LEONARD ALBRECHT; Confidential: YES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL KYLE J ESSLEY by LEONARD ALBRECHT, THOMAS AND MARY ALLEN, LEON AND TANYA ALPERT, MINNA APFELBAUM REVOCABLE TRUST filed.; Filed By: LEONARD ALBRECHT; THOMAS AND MARY ALLEN; LEON AND TANYA ALPERT; MINNA APFELBAUM REVOCABLE TRUST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order from District Court of Appeal Motion for calendar preference is DENIED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Transcripts from court reporter Sheila Detwiler filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Receipt for records on Appeal filed - Notice to prepare sent to DCA.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice to Prepare Transcript on Appeal. Record due on 01/08/20.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Filed: Notification of estimate of costs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order from District Court of Appeal Application for association of counsel GRANTED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
299 More Docket Entries
03/23/2015

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Motion, application (including ex parte) or any other paper requiring a hearing subsequent to the first paper filing (70617A); Amount: $0.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/23/2015; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2214 Receipt No.: CV150323-0584-OR.1; Paid: $60.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/26/2015; Fine Description: Void / Reversal, Reason: OTHER, CV150326-0301-VP FILING FEE S/B $500.00 WILL REPOST Receipt No.: CV150323-0584-OR.2; Paid: $60.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2015
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Electronic Service of Notice of Acknowlegdment of Receipt on County of Riverside with a service date of 03/19/15 filed. (non-complaint)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2015
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint of ALBRECHT as to COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE with receipt date of 03/18/15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amended Summons Issued on Complaint of ALBRECHT and Filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2015
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF ERRATA ON CAPTION by LEONARD ALBRECHT filed.; Filed By: LEONARD ALBRECHT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2015

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/06/2015; Fine Description: Check #24307 Receipt No.: CV150306-0686-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2015
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92262/92264.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2015
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2015
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2015
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less