Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 19:55:21 (UTC).

LEMKE VS GOULD

Case Summary

On 09/18/2008 LEMKE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOULD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8472

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

MANUEL RODRIGUEZ

JOSEPH C LEMKE SR

KATRINA K CARUSO

CHRISTINE LEMKE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

MICHAEL RAY GOULD

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

San Diego, CA 92110

ESTATE OF JOSEPH LEMKE JR

ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT COMPANY

CITY OF RIVERSIDE

Riverside, CA 92522

JOSEPH C LEMKE SR

KATRINA K CARUSO

RIVERSIDE COUNY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

MICHAEL GOULD

KATRINA KIMBERLY CARUSO

CHRISTINE LEMKE

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Not Classified By Court

RIC509639 CROSS COMPLAINT

RIC509639

RIC509639 CCOF MICHAEL R GOULD

CROSS COMPLAINT RIC510594

CROSS COMPLAINT RIC513930

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN S WOLLER

20351 Sw Acacia St

Newport Beach, CA 92660

MARCUS, GERALD L

23975 Park Sorrento Ste 230

Calabasas, CA 91302

PEACH & WEATHERS

788 No. Arrowhead Avenue Suite A

San Bernardino, CA 92402

THE TRAUT FIRM

5 Hutton Centre Dr #700

Santa Ana, CA 92707

SILVERS, MICHAEL H.

11500 W Olympic Blvd., #322

Los Angeles, CA 90064

ALDERLAW PC

1875 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

DITONTO, DOUGLAS P.

2244 Walnut Grove Avenue 3Rd Floor

Rosemead, CA 91770

LAURA A MEYERSON

2244 Walnut Grove Avenue 3Rd Floor

Rosemead, CA 91770

BELL ORROCK & WATASE

1533 Spruce St #100

Riverside, CA 92507

ORROCK POPKA FORTINO TUCKER & DOLEN

1710 Plum Lane #A

Redlands, CA 92374

ORROCK POPKA FORTINO & BRISLIN

1533 Spruce Street Suite 100

Riverside, CA 92507

LAW OFFICES OF MARC W. HAWKINS

750 North Diamond Bar Blvd. Suite 222

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Department Of Transportation 4050 Taylor Street Ms130

San Diego, CA 92110

CITY OF RIVERSIDE

3900 Main Street

Riverside, CA 92522

GONZALES, MICHAEL

2244 Walnut Grove Avenue Law Dept

Rosemead, CA 91770

CIRUCCI, PATRICIA A

2244 Walnut Grove Ave Suite 331

Rosemead, CA 91770

HAWKINS, MARC W

750 North Diamond Bar Blvd Suite#222

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

MEYERSON, LAURA A

2244 Walnut Grove Ave Ste 331

Rosemead, CA 91770

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2008 OF COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE AND FILED.

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF XCMPLT-KATRINA K CARUSO BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2008 OF COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE AS TO CHRISTINE LEMKE; MAILING DATE OF 01/31/09 FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2008 OF COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE BY KATRINA K CARUSO REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF JOHNS WOLLER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/30/2008 OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY BY KATRINA K CARUSO REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF JOHNS WOLLER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CONSOLID

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF KATRINA CARUSO BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY REPRESENTED BY DOUGLAS P. DITONTO FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SOUTHERN CA

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY REPRESENTED BY DOUGLAS P. DITONTO FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL RAY GOULD

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANA

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINE LEMKE

EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR

EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

DECLARATION OF OF MICHAEL A FO

DECLARATION OF OF MICHAEL A FORTINO IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

MOTION TO/FOR JUDGMENT ON THE

MOTION TO/FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JOSEPH LEMKE BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY ORROCK POPKA FORTINO & BRISLIN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

367 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2013
  • TRUST VOID - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • POST UNCLAIMED - JURY DEPOSIT CCP 631.3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 12/03/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 11/27/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
520 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/18/2008 OF JOSEPH LEMKE SERVED ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/25/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/18/2008 OF JOSEPH LEMKE SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/30/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 10/01/2008 OF KATRINA CARUSO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # RIC509639 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/04/09 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROSS COMPLAINT RIC510594 is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant