This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/15/2019 at 02:23:49 (UTC).

LEE VS PHENIX TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 LEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PHENIX TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3299

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID LEE

Defendant

PHENIX TRANSPORTATION WEST INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BLOMBER BENSON & GARRETT

10300 Fourth Street #150

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2019 OF DAVID LEE AND FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92234.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DAVID LEE/LAW OFFICES OF BLOMBER BENSON &GARRETT IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DAVID LEE/LAW OFFICES OF BLOMBER BENSON &GARRETT IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A TIMELY CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT CRC 3.725A.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DAVID LEE/LAW OFFICES OF BLOMBER BENSON &GARRETT IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION SET ON 11/12/19 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT 01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 11/12/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CONTINUANCE OF 11/12/19 HEARINGS; Disposition: SANCTIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 7/16/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2019 OF DAVID LEE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92234.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Phenix Transportation West Inc. is a litigant