Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/09/2018 at 23:02:05 (UTC).

LCOLDRI

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 LCOLDRI was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5453

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC

4330 La Jolla Village Dr. #310

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant

EUGENIA A AMEZQUITA

Murrieta, CA 92563

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC

4330 La Jolla Village Dr. #310

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC AND FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTIO

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 BY EUGENIA A AMEZQUITA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED.

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - COLLECTIONS - FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY EUGENIA A AMEZQUITA IS GRANTED; CLERK V ALVARADO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC SERVED ON EUGENIA A AMEZQUITA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/30/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (RIVERSIDE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTION); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 7/16/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FOR EUGENIA A AMEZQUITA WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTION) SET 11/22/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE SET ON 11/22/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - COLLECTIONS - FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY EUGENIA A AMEZQUITA IS GRANTED; CLERK V ALVARADO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 BY EUGENIA A AMEZQUITA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC SERVED ON EUGENIA A AMEZQUITA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/30/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 4/27/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less