This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/26/2020 at 18:31:13 (UTC).

LARSEN VS CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 11/30/2016 LARSEN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5799

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIOVANNI VARGAS

RALPH MESA

CESAR GUTIERREZ

MARTHA MERZA

VASSILIA IBRAHIM MANISTER

LINDA ATWOOD

MARIANA VASQUEZ

JENNIFER TORRES

JOANN ELIZABETH MORENO

JANET MESA

REGINA LAMB

DAVID THONG

JOHN LEHMANN

DAVID MILLS

NATALIA DOMINGUEZ

ALLAN ANTONIO

WAYMOND TALLEY

MARLON ROJAS

MARY BENNETT

JOSE VASQUEZ

168 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN ADELMAN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE

10250 Constellation Blvd #1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

LIEDLE LARSON LIDL& VAIL

12520 High Bluff Dr #200

San Diego, CA 92130

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A HAUSER

1551 N. Tustin Ave #830

Santa Ana, CA 92705

KUTAK ROCK LLP

5 Park Plaza #1500

Irvine, CA 92614

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

2122 North Broadway Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92706-2614

JEFFERY & GROSFELDLLP

725 Town & Country Road Suite-210

Orange, CA 92868

BLAKELY LAW OFFICE

14726 Ramona Avenue Suite E1

Chino, CA 91710

MORROW & WHITE

535 Anton Blvd Suite 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

P.O. Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164-0093

JEFFERY & GROSFELDLLP ATTORNEY AT LAW

725 Town & Country Rd, Ste 450

Orange, CA 92868

HAMMONS & BALDINO

2601 Airport Dr #105

Torrance, CA 90505

LIEDLE LARSON LIDL& VAIL LLP

12520 High Bluff Dr Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92130

NEWMEYER AND DILLION LLP

895 Dove Street 5Th Fl

Newport Beach, CA 92660

HOLLINGSHEAD & ASSOCIATES

3880 Atherton Road

Rocklin, CA 95765

MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

4100 Newport Pl Dr Ste 840

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LIEDLE LARSON & VAIL LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92130

MURCHISON & CUMMING

801 South Grand Ave 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

SKEBBA, ISAAC & BUECHLER

One Macarthur Place Ste 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

ERICKSEN ARBUTHNOT

100 Howe Avenue Ste 110 South

Sacramento, CA 95825-8201

HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

2677 North Maint St Ste200

Santa Ana, CA 92705

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MELODY RUSSELL

DECLARATION OF MELODY RUSSELL PENDELTON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED

JOINT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

JOINT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO L & S AIR CONDITIONING INC FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2018 OF CENTURY PLASTERINGINC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO NP MECHANICAL INC FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY AND AMENDMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY AND AMENDMENT TO ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS BY CENTEX HOMES FILED.

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2016 OF PETER LARSEN AS TO DEFENDANT CENTEX HOMES ADDING ATTORNEY LEE HERNANDEZ LANDRUM & GAROFOLO FILED.

ORDER AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGE

ORDER AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO HY-TECH TILE INC &SOLID SURFACES; MAILING DATE OF 04/20/18 FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CENTURY PLA

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CENTURY PLASTERINGINC REPRESENTED BY KENNEDY & SOUZA APC FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ORDER PERMITTING EVEREST NATIO

ORDER PERMITTING EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY TO FILE ANSWER-IN-INTERVENTION; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES SERVED ON REW MATERIALS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/08/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES BY CROWN SHEET METAL INC REPRESENTED BY SKEBBA, ISAAC & BUECHLER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO ALLIANCE MECHANICALCORP FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO CHARLES R WILLIAMSENTERPRISES FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM STREE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM STREET ADDRESS BY PLATINUM LANDSCAPEINC FILED.

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SET

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SET ASIDE DEFAULT RE HOMESITE SERVICES INC IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

295 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO PSLQ INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY CENTEX HOMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO FAIRWAY LANDSCAPE &IRRIGATIONINC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY CENTEX HOMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO CHAMPION WINDOWS INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY CENTEX HOMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY CROSS COMPLAINTANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2018 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO NP MECHANICAL INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
413 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketJURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY PETER LARSEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY PETER LARSEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05 - COMPLEX CASE (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 1/30/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketCOMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2016 OF PETER LARSEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2016 OF PETER LARSEN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92584.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/30/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER