This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/09/2020 at 05:57:06 (UTC).

LARA VS URBAN CONCRETE INC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 LARA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against URBAN CONCRETE INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5372

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS LARA

Defendant

URBAN CONCRETE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAMIN YOUNESSI APLC

3435 Wilshire Blvd Suite 2370

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR / TO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR / TO STAY ACTION & PROCEED W/FINAL & BINDING ARB IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE IRMA POOLE ASBERRY.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DE

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT URBAN CONCRETE, INCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY LUIS LARA FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE IN DEPARTMENT

NOTICE OF CHANGE IN DEPARTMENT FOR DEFENDANT MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY URBAN CONCRETE INC FILED.

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATI

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATION BY URBAN CONCRETE INC FILED

DECLARATION OF N HAMPTON IN SU

DECLARATION OF N HAMPTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY URBAN CONCRETE INC FILED.

DECLARATION OF J DEWEY IN SUPP

DECLARATION OF J DEWEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/28/2019 OF LUIS LARA AS TO URBAN CONCRETE INC; MAILING DATE OF 11/14/19 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEAPRTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/28/2019 OF LUIS LARA AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATION BY URBAN CONCRETE INC; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - RES98415; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR / TO STAY ACTION & PROCEED W/FINAL & BINDING ARB IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE IRMA POOLE ASBERRY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT URBAN CONCRETE, INCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY LUIS LARA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY LUIS LARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY LUIS LARA, URBAN CONCRETE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY LUIS LARA

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/28/2019 OF LUIS LARA AS TO URBAN CONCRETE INC; MAILING DATE OF 11/14/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docket--AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/28/2019 OF LUIS LARA SERVED ON URBAN CONCRETE INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/14/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/28/2019 OF LUIS LARA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/25/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEAPRTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URBAN CONCRETE INC is a litigant