Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 12:05:48 (UTC).

LANTZ VS SHEN

Case Summary

On 01/16/2014 LANTZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0072

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEN LANTZ

Defendant

ANNI SHEN

Cabazon, CA 92220

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C CASS WATTERS

P.O. Box 1695

Barstow, CA 92312

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92230.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ FILED.

MOTION TO QUASH AND NOTICE OF

MOTION TO QUASH AND NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY ANNI SHEN FILED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ANNI SHEN IS GRANTED; CLERK BA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/16/2014 OF BEN LANTZ AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 01/30/14.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/16/2014 OF BEN LANTZ AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL ANNI SHEN BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 01/30/14.

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIO

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH BY BEN LANTZ FILED UNTIMELY PER 1005CCP/3.1300(D)CRC/437C(B)CCP.

DEMURRER TO THE UNLAWFUL DETAI

DEMURRER TO THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/16/2014 OF BEN LANTZ FILED BY ANNI SHEN REPRESENTED BY (BANNING)

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMUR

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER BY BEN LANTZ FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 04/02/14 B1 JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ).

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON C CASS WATTERS ESQ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/07/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - ENTIRE CASE AUTOMATIC STAY FILING IN ANOTHER COURT (BANKRUPTCY, ETC) BY ANNI SHEN FILED (FORM CM-180).

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/16/2014 OF BEN LANTZ AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY DE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ORIGINALLY SET FOR 041614 HAS BEEN CONTINUED, AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BEN LANTZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ORIGINALLY SET FOR 041614 HAS BEEN CONTINUED, AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/16/2014 OF BEN LANTZ AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • HEARING RE: BANKRUPTCY STATUS/COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • FEE PAID FOR POSTAGE AND ENVELOPE BY PLAINTIFF (5 PAGES OR LESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY BEN LANTZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/19/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92230.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATTERS, C CASS