This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/23/2018 at 15:03:34 (UTC).

LANSDOWNE VS DESERT MEDICAL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 LANSDOWNE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DESERT MEDICAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1962

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANSDOWNE EQUITY VENTURES USA INC

Defendant

DESERT MEDICAL GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS W HARRISJR

41455 Carlotta Drive

Palm Desert, CA 92211-3267

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/06/2018 OF LANSDOWNE EQUITY VENTURES USA INC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/05/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/06/2018 OF LANSDOWNE EQUITY VENTURES USA INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Desert Medical Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THE LAW OFFICES OFTHOMAS W HARRIS JR