This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:00:36 (UTC).

LAMAR VS SAN GORGONIO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 11/19/2014 LAMAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAN GORGONIO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1188

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

KAYLA LAMAR

BROOKLYN LAMAR

CONNOR LAMAR

DONALD LAMAR

Defendants

RICHARD PRECI M.D.

EVAN HOUCK M.D.

CHRISTOPHER ROBERTSON P.A.

RYAN ROTEN D.O.

PALO VERDE HEALTH CARE DISTRICT

PALO VERDE HOSPITAL

ROBERT STRECKER M.D.

MARLA DUBINSKY M.D.

SUSANNA NICHOLASS M.D.

SAN GORGONIO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

BETTY STEPIEN M.D.

YOGENDRA PATEL M.D.

LUDWIG CIBELLI M.D.

AALOK SHAH M.D.

PUROSHOTHAM RAMAIAH M.D.

HOSPIRA INC

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

LAW, PATRICIA A

4371 Latham Street Suite 205

Riverside, CA 92501

LAW OFFICES OF PATRICIA A LAW

10837 Laurel Street Suite 101

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorneys

BASSETT, DISCOE, MCMAINS & KARGOZAR

1551 North Tustin Avenue Suite 900

Santa Ana, CA 92705

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS M STEFANELLI

777 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite 200-157

Palm Springs, CA 92262

KRAMER DEBOER & KEANE

74-770 Us Highway 111 #201

Indian Wells, CA 92210

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

LA FOLLETTE,JOHNSON, DEHAAS, FESLER & AMES

2677 N Main St., Ste 901

Santa Ana, CA 92705

NORTON ROSE FULBRIGHT US LLP

555 South Flower Street 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

333 South Hope St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MORRIS, POLICH & PURDY

600 W. Broadway Ste 500

San Diego, CA 92101-3357

WFBM LLP

One City Blvd West Fifth Floor

Orange, CA 92868-3677

WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

REED SMITH LLP

355 South Grand Ave. Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

TUCKER ELLIS LLP

515 S. Flower St. 42Nd Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY AND POPEO

2029 Century Park East Suite 1370

Los Angeles, CA 90067

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

2050 Main St, Ste 600

Irvine, CA 92614

CLARK HILL LLP

1055 W Seventh St 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

GORDON & REES LLP

101 West Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

1840 Century Park East #1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO DEFTS OPPO TO MTN FOR

REPLY TO DEFTS OPPO TO MTN FOR PROTECTIVE ORDR TO PRECLUDE BY KAYLA LAMAR, BROOKLYN LAMAR, CONNOR LAMAR, DONALD LAMAR FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SAN GORGONIO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, RICHARD PRECI M.D., EVAN HOUCK M.D., CHRISTOPHER ROBERTSON P.A., RYAN ROTEN D.O.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YOGENDRA PATEL M.D.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATERIAL FACTS

ERRATA/NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED

ERRATA/NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY SAN GORGONIO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF KAYLA LAMAR SERVED ON CLARIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/11/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY B.

MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY B. BRAUN MEDICAL INC. FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION OF/TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMAND BY TEVA PARENTERAL MEDICINES INC FILED.

REPLY TO TEVAS OPPO TO MTN TO

REPLY TO TEVAS OPPO TO MTN TO COMPEL RESP TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET NO 1 BY KAYLA LAMAR FILED

PLTFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DI

PLTFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED RESPONSES RE PLTFS MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY M

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MARLA DUBINSKY M.D. FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY K

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY KAYLA LAMAR, BROOKLYN LAMAR, CONNOR LAMAR, DONALD LAMAR FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

RYAN ROTEN, DO. SEPARATE STMT/

RYAN ROTEN, DO. SEPARATE STMT/UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RIC1411

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RIC1411188 BY SAN GORGONIO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REPLY TO PLTFS OPPO TO MTN TO STRIKE ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/18/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

DECLARATION OF KEVIN G LOHMAN

DECLARATION OF KEVIN G LOHMAN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3116 IN OPPO TO CONSOL OF RIC1411188 & RIC1513784 FILED

REGISTER OF ACTIONS ON RIC1513

REGISTER OF ACTIONS ON RIC1513784 THROUGH 05/18/16

MOTION TO/FOR QUASH SERVICE OF

MOTION TO/FOR QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC FILED

597 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PATRICIA A LAW REQUESTING THAT THE COURT ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR BY PHONE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS - RES91574; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS RAFFI SIMONIAN, PHAR MD BY KAYLA LAMAR, BROOKLYN LAMAR, CONNOR LAMAR, DONALD LAMAR; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY PATRICIA LAW FOR PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY KAYLA LAMAR; DONALD LAMAR; BROOKLYN LAMAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO DEFT SAN GORGONIO MEMORIAL HOSPITALS MTN TO PRECLUDE DEFTS EXPERT WITNESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MTN TO PLTFS MTN TO PRECLUDE EXPERT WITNESS BY SAN GORGONIO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • FEE PAID FOR ON-LINE RESERVATION OF MOTION ($60.00). CONFIRMATION NUMBER RES91574 FOR HEARING RESERVED ON 08/01/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
1,205 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF DONALD LAMAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF BROOKLYN LAMAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/19/2014 OF KAYLA LAMAR FOR CONNOR LAMAR APPOINTING DONALD LAMAR AS GUARDIAN; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF CONNOR LAMAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/19/2014 OF KAYLA LAMAR FOR BROOKLYN LAMAR APPOINTING DONALD LAMAR AS GUARDIAN; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • FAX FILING BY KAYLA LAMAR ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospira, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED SMITH (LORENZO GASPARETTI)