This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 12:25:07 (UTC).

LAKE ELSINORE VS BENDER

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 LAKE ELSINORE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BENDER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0532

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC

Defendants

ERIC FOSTER

Lake Elsinore, CA 92530

ANEKA BENDER

Lake Elsinore, CA 92530

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

308 N Riverside Ave #2E

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2017 OF LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2017 OF LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC BY ANEKA BENDER, ERIC FOSTER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON LAKE ELSINORE APTS/ACESSS ASSET MANAGMENT WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/10/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ANEKA BENDER IS GRA; CLERK M LOPEZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ERIC FOSTER IS GRA; CLERK M LOPEZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2017 OF LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/05/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2017 OF LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 05/05/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 05/05/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2017 OF LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2017 OF LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/05/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON LAKE ELSINORE APTS/ACESSS ASSET MANAGMENT WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/10/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2017 OF LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC BY ANEKA BENDER, ERIC FOSTER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/31/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2017 OF LAKE ELSINORE APT LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less