This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 10:50:53 (UTC).

LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT vs BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2202

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

SELF INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COZEN O'CONNOR

501 W. Broadway #1610

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAFIK AYVAZI TYSON & MENDES LLP

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RAFIK AYVAZI TYSON & MENDES LLP

Cross Defendant Attorney

ATKINSON, ANDELSON. LOYA, RUUD & ROMO

Attorney at ATKINSON, ANDELSON. LOYA, RUUD & ROMO

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

12/08/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

08/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

07/02/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

06/24/2021: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

STIPULATION & ORDER TO ALLOW PLA TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT on Complaint of LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

04/02/2021: STIPULATION & ORDER TO ALLOW PLA TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT on Complaint of LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

1st Amended Complaint LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

04/02/2021: 1st Amended Complaint LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Amended Case Management Statement

03/24/2021: Amended Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing

04/02/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/02/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/02/2021: Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement

03/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing

12/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

12/15/2020: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725

12/14/2020: Case Management Statement filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725

Case Management Statement

12/08/2020: Case Management Statement

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c); Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; SELF INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: TSC Set

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: CROSS-COMPLAINT of BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC represented by TYSON & MENDES LLP filed (SUPERIOR COURT); Filed By: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT by BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC represented by TYSON & MENDES LLP filed. (Over $25,000.00); Filed By: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketFilings: Cross Complaint of BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 08/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT served on BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC with service date of 07/13/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/01/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2042 Receipt No.: CV200701-0282-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less