This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/30/2018 at 04:50:21 (UTC).

L.A. COMMERCIAL VS COWBOY JOE'S

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 L A COMMERCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COWBOY JOE'S. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8543

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC.

Defendants

COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALOON INC.

JOSEPH LEON BAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JESSICA L LEMOINE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. AND FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. SERVED ON COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/20/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. AS TO COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC. FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (RIVERSIDE); Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC./LAW OFFICES OF JESSICA L LEMOINE IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.110).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • HEARING RE ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE SET 7/03/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. AS TO COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC. FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. SERVED ON COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/20/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 10/15/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less