This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/30/2018 at 04:50:21 (UTC).

L.A. COMMERCIAL VS COWBOY JOE'S

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 L A COMMERCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COWBOY JOE'S. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8543

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC.

Defendants

COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALOON INC.

JOSEPH LEON BAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JESSICA L LEMOINE

Po Box 251450 317 So Brand Blvd

Glendale, CA 91225

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. AND FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. SERVED ON COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/20/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. AS TO COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC. FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (RIVERSIDE); Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC./LAW OFFICES OF JESSICA L LEMOINE IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.110).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • HEARING RE ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE SET 7/03/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. AS TO COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC. FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. SERVED ON COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/20/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 09/25/2017 OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 10/15/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALOON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. A CORPORATION DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP is a litigant