This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/04/2019 at 08:11:42 (UTC).

KOVALCHUK VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 KOVALCHUK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0514

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAUL KOVALCHUK

Hemet, CA 92544

Defendant

ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITYCOMPANY

P O Box 660598

Dallas, TX 75266-0598

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION FOR JENNIFER LAR

AUTHORIZATION FOR JENNIFER LARDIZABAL TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITYCOMPANY FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 09/17/2018 OF PAUL KOVALCHUK SERVED ON ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITYCOMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/19/18 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (HEMET).

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 10/29/18 RE: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR JENNIFER LARDIZABAL TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITYCOMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - HEMET; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 09/17/2018 OF PAUL KOVALCHUK SERVED ON ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITYCOMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/19/18 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET FOR 10/29/18, AT 13:30, IN DEPT. H1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT H1. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (HEMET).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMINITY COMPANY is a litigant