This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 00:03:20 (UTC).

KORGAN VS SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 KORGAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5065

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIE KORGAN

Defendants

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VICTIM COMPENSATION LAW GROUP APC

287 S Robertson Blvd #302

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP

4204 Riverwalk Pkwy., Ste.250

Riverside, CA 92505

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

550 South Hope Street Ste 2550

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARIE KORGAN

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 6/17/19.

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUN

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARIE KORGAN

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANA

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN BY SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING INC REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/24/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN SERVED ON SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/24/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN AND FILED.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 9/09/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • COURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 12/05/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 12/05/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 03 - RES92759.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN BY SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING INC REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN SERVED ON SOUTHSTAR ENGINEERING AND CONSULTING INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/24/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/24/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 9/24/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/24/2018 OF MARIE KORGAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southstar Engineering and Consulting, Inc. is a litigant