Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/05/2021 at 01:15:57 (UTC).

KOREA RESOLUTION VS NAM

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 KOREA RESOLUTION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against NAM. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jackson Lucky. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3439

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jackson Lucky

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOREA RESOLUTION &COLLECTION CORPORATION

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

Defendants

DONG GEUN SHIN

JAEWON SHIN

HYUN JUNG NAM

HYUN JUNG SHIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHANA & FELD LLP

Attorney at KAHANA & FELD LLP

2603 Main Street Suite 350

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorney

KRING & CHUNG

Attorney at KRING & CHUNG

38 Corporate Park

Irvine, CA 92606

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

03/02/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

System Generated Notice re: Clerks certificate of mailing.

06/09/2020: System Generated Notice re: Clerks certificate of mailing.

Case Management Statement filed by HYUN JUNG SHIN, JAEWON SHIN

06/01/2020: Case Management Statement filed by HYUN JUNG SHIN, JAEWON SHIN

Revised Decl of M Ahn re OSC for Failure to File a Proof of Service and Sanctions Imposed filed

06/01/2020: Revised Decl of M Ahn re OSC for Failure to File a Proof of Service and Sanctions Imposed filed

Declaration of Mimi Ahn re OSC for Failure to File a Proof of Service and Sanctions Imposed filed

06/01/2020: Declaration of Mimi Ahn re OSC for Failure to File a Proof of Service and Sanctions Imposed filed

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

03/17/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Notice of Department Reassignment for all purposes Hearing re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE is rescheduled to 03/17/20 at 8:30 in Department 10.

01/31/2020: Notice of Department Reassignment for all purposes Hearing re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE is rescheduled to 03/17/20 at 8:30 in Department 10.

System Generated Notice re: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

12/12/2019: System Generated Notice re: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

System Generated Notice re: Failure to File Proof of Service to all Parties.

10/22/2019: System Generated Notice re: Failure to File Proof of Service to all Parties.

Notice OF PENDENCY OF ACTION CCP 405.20 - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 3156 WINDHAVEN WAY CORONA CA 92882 by KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION filed.

09/17/2019: Notice OF PENDENCY OF ACTION CCP 405.20 - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 3156 WINDHAVEN WAY CORONA CA 92882 by KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION served on HYUN JUNG NAM with service date of 08/27/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

09/09/2019: Proof of Service on the Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION served on HYUN JUNG NAM with service date of 08/27/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

Proof of Service on the Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION served on JAEWON SHIN with service date of 08/30/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

09/05/2019: Proof of Service on the Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION served on JAEWON SHIN with service date of 08/30/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

Proof of Service on the Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION served on HYUN JUNG NAM with service date of 08/27/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

08/30/2019: Proof of Service on the Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION served on HYUN JUNG NAM with service date of 08/27/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

06/19/2019: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c); Judicial Officer: Jackson Lucky; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Jackson Lucky; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference; Filed By: KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Jackson Lucky; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation and protective order; Filed By: KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Proposed Order re: Stipulation and protective order; Filed By: KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/03/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9546 Receipt No.: 20210203-00482.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION served on HYUN JUNG NAM with service date of 08/27/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/20/2019; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV190620-0505-V.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Shipping costs for transcripts for civil cases on appeal/Returning file stamped copies of documents by fax (CRC10.815); Amount: $22.00; Paid: $22.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/20/2019; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV190620-0508-V.1; Paid: $22.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92882.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION is a litigant