This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 13:08:08 (UTC).

KOBE JAPANESE STEAK HOUSE VS SADORRA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/28/2013 KOBE JAPANESE STEAK HOUSE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SADORRA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0623

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOBE JAPANESE STEAK HOUSE LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DENNIS SADORRA

RPM CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT

RPM

SADORRA LLC

PATRICK LANE CHAFFIN

GILBERT HENRY BUELNA JR

FRANK ESQUIBEL

LEVI FLORES GALLEGOS DBA LEVI & CO

RAYGOZA/SADORRA CONSTRUCTION INC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GURALNICK & GILLILAND

40004 Cook Street Suite 3

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WAIT & COLFER

250 West First Street Ste 222

Claremont, CA 91711

PHILIP A KRAFT & ASSOCIATES

3234 Grey Hawk Court

Carlsbad, CA 92010

BONETATI & KINCAIDINC

2020 North Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC FILED

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON RPM CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/03/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON SADORRA LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/02/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON DENNIS SADORRA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/02/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON GILBERT HENRY BUELNA JR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/04/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON FRANK ESQUIBEL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/09/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC AS TO RPM; MAILING DATE OF 02/13/13 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC AS TO PATRICK LANE CHAFFIN; MAILING DATE OF 02/15/13 FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC BY PATRICK LANE CHAFFIN REPRESENTED BY WAIT & COLFER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES BY PATRICK LANE CHAFFIN FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC BY FRANK ESQUIBEL REPRESENTED BY BONETATI & KINCAIDINC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY FRANK ESQUIBEL.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GILBERT HEN

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GILBERT HENRY BUELNA JR REPRESENTED BY PHILIP A KRAFT & ASSOCIATES FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPR

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPRINGS AND REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO PS1 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC BY GILBERT HENRY BUELNA JR REPRESENTED BY PHILIP A KRAFT & ASSOCIATES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - RES32510; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED SET 05/15/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS1 - RES32510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF JOSE AGUAYO DBA MASTER METALS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC BY LEVI FLORES GALLEGOS DBA LEVI &CO REPRESENTED BY BONETATI & KINCAIDINC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE INC 1203442 AND INC 13000623; INC 1203442 DESIGNATED AS THE MASTER FILE; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC AS TO LEVI FLORES GALLEGOS DBA LEVI &CO MAILING DATE OF 08/06/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC AS TO RAYGOZA/SADORRA CONSTRUCTION INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON FRANK ESQUIBEL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/09/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO REAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SUBMITTED BY KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON GILBERT HENRY BUELNA JR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/04/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON DENNIS SADORRA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/02/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON SADORRA LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/02/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC SERVED ON RPM CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/03/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2013 OF KOBE JAPANESE STEAKHOUSE LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RPM CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where RPM, INC. is a litigant