This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 08:22:11 (UTC).

KINGS GARDEN INC vs MYDAX INC

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 KINGS GARDEN INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MYDAX INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4545

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINGS GARDEN INC

Defendant

MYDAX INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOREN OSHER & LUFTMAN LLP

Attorney at BOREN OSHER & LUFTMAN LLP

Defendant Attorney

Kirk Steven Rimmer

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

07/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

04/05/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Deposit of Jury Fees

03/29/2021: Deposit of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

03/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

02/18/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

Answer to Complaint on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

02/18/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

Stipulation to Vacate Default and Order on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

01/28/2021: Stipulation to Vacate Default and Order on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110)

12/08/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110)

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

11/24/2020: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

Proof of Service on the Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC served on MYDAX INC with service date of 10/20/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

10/23/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC served on MYDAX INC with service date of 10/20/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

Notice of Case reassigned to Department PS1 for all purposes.

10/19/2020: Notice of Case reassigned to Department PS1 for all purposes.

170.6 CCP filed by KINGS GARDEN INC against Pro Tem David M. Chapman is granted.

10/19/2020: 170.6 CCP filed by KINGS GARDEN INC against Pro Tem David M. Chapman is granted.

Summons Issued on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC and filed.

10/06/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92262.

10/05/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92262.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

10/05/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

10/05/2020: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

10/05/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: KINGS GARDEN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to KINGS GARDEN INC; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued - Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/05/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1469 Receipt No.: 20210405-00467.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.; Filed By: KINGS GARDEN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6564 Receipt No.: 20210329-00593.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Deposit of Jury Fees; Filed By: MYDAX INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC served on MYDAX INC with service date of 10/20/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case reassigned to Department PS1 for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 170.6 CCP filed by KINGS GARDEN INC against Pro Tem David M. Chapman is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/06/2020; Fine Description: Master Card Receipt No.: CV201006-0072-MC.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92262.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of KINGS GARDEN INC; Disposition: Dismissal After Other ADR 07/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kings Garden Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirk S. Rimmer