This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 14:03:29 (UTC).

KING VS PULTE HOME COPRPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/21/2011 KING filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME COPRPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2188

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NUMERIANO BUETA

ELVA CAMPOS

ELVA ESTELA CAMPOS

JOSE CARDENAS

NEREYDA CARDENAS

HUNG CHUN CHONG

JEONG YE CHONG

STEVE COLLINS

TISHA COLLINS

VIRGINIA CRISOSTOMO

JEREMIAS CRISOTOMO

MARVIN CUADRA

JACKIE CUADRA

REYNALDO DEQUIT

REVELINA DEQUIT

PEDRO DOMINGUEZ

LEROY DUBOSE

PAMELA DUBOSE

GLADYS FIGUEROA

Interested Party and Intervenor Plaintiff

INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY

195 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN ADELMAN LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd #1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

SPRINGEL & FINK

535 Anton Blvd.,9Th Flr

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Other Attorneys

KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALLUCK

3 Park Plaza Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614-8557

MURCHISON & CUMMING

801 S.Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BULLARD BROWN & BEAL, LLP

3890 11Th Street Suite 111

Riverside, CA 92501

ARCHER NORRIS

4695 Macarthur Court #350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

BREMER, WHYTE, BROWN OMEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

HAMRICK & EVANS LLP

111 Universal Hollywood Drive Suite 2200

Universal City, CA 91608

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Ste 105

Torrance, CA 90505

STUTZ, ARTIANO, SHINOFF & HOLTZ

43513 Ridge Park Drive

Temecula, CA 92590

TARLE LAW PC

500 N. Capital Of Texas Hwy. The Reserve Bldg 3 #125

Austin, TX 78746

FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT

5720 Oberlin Drive

San Diego, CA 92121-1723

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave #750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

HINES CARDER

3090 Bristol St., Ste. 300

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 E Hospitality Lane #600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LIEDLE, LOUNSBERY,LARSON, & LIDI LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E Hospitality Lane #600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

MCMAHON LAW FIRM, INC.

980 Montecito Drive Suite 208

Corona, CA 92879

LAW OFFICES OF ZAIDA A MCGHEE

1101 Dove Street #255

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LIEDLE LOUNSBERY LARSON & LIDILLP

12520 High Bluff Dr #200

San Diego, CA 92130

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANN

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY P

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/15/2011 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION AS TO MON-MAY ENTERPRISES; MAILING DATE OF 01/13/12 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/15/2011 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION SERVED ON WILLIAMS MECHANICALINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/12/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/15/2011 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION AS TO WESTERN SHOWER DOORINC; MAILING DATE OF 01/17/12 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/15/2011 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION AS TO HERMANOS GRADING INC; MAILING DATE OF 01/13/12 FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LEONARD ROO

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LEONARD ROOFING INC REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/16/2012 OF LEONARD ROOFING INC AND FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/15/2011 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION BY CAPITAL DRYWALL INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING AS TO PLAINTIFF JOSE CARDENAS, NEREYDA CARDENAS, HUNG CHUN CHONG, JEONG YE CHONG FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/15/2011 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION NAMING ROES/MOES 4 TO BE THE BIG COMPANY FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY V

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY VALENTE CONCRETE, INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING BY CALIFORNIA PLASTERING INC REPRESENTED BY MURCHISON & CUMMINGLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF OF JEFFREY M. M

DECLARATION OF OF JEFFREY M. MCCONNELL RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6(A)(2) BY JT CONSTRUCTION INC FILED.

ORDER TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE IN

ORDER TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE INSURANCE REP TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE MSC IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE DALLAS SCOTT HOLMES.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING BY GUY EVANS INC REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING SERVED ON GUY EVANS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/24/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

239 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2013
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE SUBMITTED BY INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/08/2012 OF BENEDETTI CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/15/2011 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PLFTS SUMMARY BRIEF IN PREPARATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATED COUNSEL FOR LEONARD ROOFING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
383 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2011
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING SERVED ON PULTE HOME CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/27/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SHANNON KING FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/21/2011 OF SHANNON KING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/21/2011 OF SHANNON KING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/19/11 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 12 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Interstate Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES CARDER