This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/27/2021 at 01:25:37 (UTC).

KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT vs TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOWN COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL A OTTOLIA, Daniel Ottolia and GARY B TRANBARGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7866

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL A OTTOLIA

Daniel Ottolia

GARY B TRANBARGER

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

MINERVA MUNOZ

Cross Defendants and Defendants

MICHELLE LIGHT BAKER

TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP

JOSEPH L BAKER II

DOWNTOWN CAPITAL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MICHAEL RAHIMI

DIAMOND B RANCH ENT INC

COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALOON INC

JOSEPH L BAKER, II

KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

MINERVA MUNOZ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D WEISS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D WEISS

26459 Rancho Parkway South

Lake Forest, CA 92630

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

VIVOLI SACCUZZO, LLP

Attorney at VIVOLI SACCUZZO, LLP

2550 5Th Ave, Ninth Floor

San Diego, CA 92103

VIVOLI SCACCUZZO LLP

3104 Fourth Avenue

San Diego, CA 92101

VIVOLI SACCUZZO LLP

3104 Fourth Avenue

San Diego, CA 92103

VIVOLI SACCUZZO LLP VIVOLI SACCUZZO, LLP

Attorney at VIVOLI SACCUZZO LLP VIVOLI SACCUZZO, LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted

10/13/2021: Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted

Certificate of Mailing

10/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order/ Writ of Attachment filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP

09/30/2020: Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order/ Writ of Attachment filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP

Legacy Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference

02/20/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference

Amended Minute Order: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication

07/21/2021: Amended Minute Order: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication

Notice of Document Return.

08/30/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

09/22/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service 1. Notice of Submission of Proposed Statement of Decision for Phase 1 of Trial and 2. Proposed Statement of Decision on Phase 1 of Trial

09/21/2021: Proof of Service 1. Notice of Submission of Proposed Statement of Decision for Phase 1 of Trial and 2. Proposed Statement of Decision on Phase 1 of Trial

Notice of Submission of Proposed Statement of Decision for Phase 1 of Trial

09/21/2021: Notice of Submission of Proposed Statement of Decision for Phase 1 of Trial

Defendant/Cross-Complainant's Closing Brief

09/21/2021: Defendant/Cross-Complainant's Closing Brief

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

09/27/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

Plaintiffs Brief on the Courts Ruling on Phase 1 Issues on 1st Amended Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

09/23/2021: Plaintiffs Brief on the Courts Ruling on Phase 1 Issues on 1st Amended Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

Notice of Document Return.

09/22/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of lodging Proposed Statement of Decision for Phase One of the Trial on 1st Amended Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

09/21/2021: Notice of lodging Proposed Statement of Decision for Phase One of the Trial on 1st Amended Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

Tentative Court's Ruling on the List of Phase 1 Issues

09/09/2021: Tentative Court's Ruling on the List of Phase 1 Issues

Minute Order: Jury Trial

10/14/2021: Minute Order: Jury Trial

Minute Order: Court Trial - In Progress

09/09/2021: Minute Order: Court Trial - In Progress

Minute Order: Court Trial - In Progress

09/07/2021: Minute Order: Court Trial - In Progress

380 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingType: Ruling on Matter Submitted; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiffs Brief on the Courts Ruling on Phase 1 Issues on 1st Amended Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT; Filed By: KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT; MINERVA MUNOZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
350 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demurrer to Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP represented by VIVOLI SACCUZZO, LLP filed.; Filed By: TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS L.P'S DEMURRER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Judicial Notice filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP.; Filed By: TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of NTC/HRG/DEMURRER/MEMO/DECL/REQ JUDICIAL NTC/APPEND served on SEE SERVICE LIST served 10/15/18 Filed (non-complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DFT TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP'S DEMURRER/CMPLT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT as to TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP; mailing date of 09/05/18 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/28/2018; Fine Description: Check #1379 Receipt No.: CV180828-0474-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92860.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAMOND B RANCH ENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP is a litigant