This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/24/2017 at 06:16:40 (UTC).

KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT VS BAKER

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAKER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9882

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT

Defendants

COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALOON INC

MICHELLE BAKER

JOSEPH L BARKER II

DIAMOND B RANCH ENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D WEISS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92860.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) JOSEPH L BARKER II FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO MICHELLE BAKER FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO DIAMOND B RANCH ENTINC FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO MICHELLE BAKER; MAILING DATE OF 06/06/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON DIAMOND B RANCH ENTINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON JOSEPH L BARKER II WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT/LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D WEISS IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.110).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • HEARING RE ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE SET 1/17/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) JOSEPH L BARKER II FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO MICHELLE BAKER FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO DIAMOND B RANCH ENTINC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AS TO COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • --AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON COWBOY JOE'S SPORTSSALOON INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • --AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON MICHELLE BAKER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/06/17 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • --AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON DIAMOND B RANCH ENTINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON DIAMOND B RANCH ENTINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON JOSEPH L BARKER II WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • --AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT SERVED ON JOSEPH L BARKER II WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/02/17 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/01/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2017 OF KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92860.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less