Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 17:22:32 (UTC).

KEY EQUIPMENT VS PROFESSIONAL HEALTHCARE

Case Summary

On 06/27/2011 KEY EQUIPMENT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROFESSIONAL HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0178

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC

Defendants

PROFESSIONAL HEALTHCARE BILLING INC

ANDREW GRIMALDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYNICK, GEORGE R.

5000 N. Parkway Calabasas Suite 219

Calabasas, CA 91302-1400

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC AND FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEA

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - BLYTHE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS AS PER ANDREW GRIMALDA FILED.

APPLICATION FOR FOR PUBLICATIO

APPLICATION FOR FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS AS PER PRO HEALTHCARE B FILED.

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMO

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC AS TO PROFESSIONAL HEALTHCARE BILLINGINC FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMO

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC AS TO ANDREW GRIMALDA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PUBLICATION)

PROOF OF SERVICE (PUBLICATION) OF THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC AS TO PROFESSIONAL HEALTHCARE BILLINGINC, ANDREW GRIMALDA WITH FINAL PUBLICATION DATE OF 06/13/12 FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC AS TO PROFESSIONAL HEALTHCARE BILLINGINC, ANDREW GRIMALDA FILED.

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ON

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC AS TO PROFESSIONAL HEALTHCARE BILLINGINC, ANDREW GRIMALDA FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC FILED.

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SU

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DE FILED

AMENDED PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMEN

AMENDED PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPO FILED BY KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT (ENTIRE AC

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED ORANGE COUNTY

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED ORANGE COUNTY COUNTY

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED ORANGE COUNTY COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • NO SELF ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE WAS SUBMITTED FOR CONFORMED COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPO FILED BY KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC RE WHY UNSERVED PARTIES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - BLYTHE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • HEARING ON OSC RE WHY UNSERVED PARTIES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC.; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • BNPS HEARING SET FOR 08/26/11 AT 10:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: SET DISMISSAL HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • BLYTHE NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2011 OF KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEY EQUIPMENT FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HYNICK LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE R.