This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/04/2016 at 19:15:12 (UTC).

KELTNER VS. CALIFORNIAN-MAGNOLIA CONVALESCENT

Case Summary

On 10/31/2014 KELTNER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIAN-MAGNOLIA CONVALESCENT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0295

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERT KELTNER

JOHN KELTNER

FREDERICK KELTNER

KATHLEEN OHLEY

SUZANNE DIX

Defendants

CALIFORNIAN-MAGNOLIA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

CHAPMAN CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL,INC

LAWRENCE E CLARK MD

TEREK MAHDI MD

AMEETA KHARBANDA MD

WASEEM N IBRAHIM M.D

DEREK NGUYEN MD

CLARISA YOS NP

COLUMBIA RIVERSIDE, INC.

YTHANH D NGUYEN M.D

AHMED KHEITER M.D

TAREK MAHDI MD

MINA N MIKHAIL MD

DEEPAK CHANDWANI M.D

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUMMINGS, MCCLOREY, DAVIS, ACHO & ASSOCIATE

3801 University Avenue Suite 560

Riverside, CA 92501

CUMMINGS MCCLOREY DAVID ACHO & ASSOCIATES

3801 University Ave #560

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant Attorneys

MORRIS, POLICH & PURDY

1055 W 7Th St., 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HULBERT & HULBERT

734 Silver Spur Rd #306

Rolling Hills Esates, CA 90274

DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

SCHMID & VOILES

333 City Boulevard West Suite 2000

Orange, CA 92868

WALKER AND MANN LLP

10832 Laurel Street Suite 204

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

KRAMER DEBOER & KEANE

74-770 Us Highway 111 #201

Indian Wells, CA 92210

CREASON & AARVIG, LLP

32 Executive Park Suite 105

Irvine, CA 92614

NEIL, DYMOTT, FRANK, MCFALL & TREXLER

43920 Margarita Road Suite B

Temecula, CA 92592

DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

11755 Wilshire Blvd 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Other Attorneys

GONZALEZ & HULBERTLLP

101 N. Brand Boulevard Suite 1880

Glendale, CA 91203

CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN & MCKENNA

111 West Ocean Blvd 14Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF OF LARRY A DUNL

DECLARATION OF OF LARRY A DUNLAP IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTIO N TO STRIKE FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF P

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFS 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY JOHNNY A LIQUETE M.D FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION OF/TO CHAPMAN CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INCS DEMURRER BY JOHN KELTNER, FREDERICK KELTNER, KATHLEEN OHLEY, JOHN KELTNER, SUZANNE DIX FILED.

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROBERT KELTNER BY DEREK NGUYEN MD, YTHANH D NGUYEN MD, AMEETA KHARBANDA MD, MINA N MIKHAIL MD REPRESENTED BY SCHMID & VOILES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF OF GARY LEDFORD

DECLARATION OF OF GARY LEDFORD IN SUPPORT OF NON PARTY FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES FILED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DEEPAK CHANDWANI M.D.

DECLARATION OF OF MATTHEW N TR

DECLARATION OF OF MATTHEW N TROTTER ESQ IN SUPPORT OF DEFT CARL WOLNISTY MDS APPL GFS FILED FILED

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF /IN SUPP

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF /IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEEPAK CHANDWANI M.D.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN REPLY OF/TO OPPO TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIE BY ROBERT KELTNER FILED.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION OF/TO DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT BY JOHN KELTNER, FREDERICK KELTNER, KATHLEEN OHLEY, JOHN KELTNER, SUZANNE DIX FILED.

REPLY TO /IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

REPLY TO /IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMP BY CALIFORNIAN-MAGNOLIA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROBERT KELTNER BY CHAPMAN CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL,INC FILED

DECLARATION OF RYAN D MILLER I

DECLARATION OF RYAN D MILLER IN OPPO TO RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITALS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ROBERT KELTNER, JOHN KELTNER, FREDERICK KELTNER, KATHLEEN OHLEY, JOHN KELTNER.

329 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROBERT KELTNER BY YTHANH D NGUYEN M.D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROBERT KELTNER BY MINA N MIKHAIL MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROBERT KELTNER BY DEREK NGUYEN MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROBERT KELTNER BY AMEETA KHARBANDA MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
806 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2014
  • ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF TAREK MAHDI, M.D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 01/26/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 06 - RES39866.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF ROBERT KELTNER AS TO TEREK MAHDI MD; MAILING DATE OF 11/10/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF ROBERT KELTNER AS TO TEREK MAHDI MD; MAILING DATE OF 11/10/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF ROBERT KELTNER AS TO CHAPMAN CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL,INC; MAILING DATE OF 11/10/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF ROBERT KELTNER AS TO CALIFORNIAN-MAGNOLIA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL; MAILING DATE OF 11/10/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less