This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/26/2017 at 09:29:49 (UTC).

KEATON VS STEVE P RADOS INC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2017 KEATON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against STEVE P RADOS INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5268

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANQUAN KEATON

Defendants

JEFF MCGRAND

MIKE W.B.

STEVE P RADOS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC

225 Santa Monica Blvd #700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorney

FISHER & PHILLIPS

2050 Main Street Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK -

COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK - TRANSFER

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT TO SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2017 OF SANQUAN KEATON SERVED ON STEVE P RADOS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/21/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2017 OF SANQUAN KEATON AS TO JEFF MCGRAND; MAILING DATE OF 05/09/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2017 OF SANQUAN KEATON AS TO MIKE W.B.; MAILING DATE OF 05/03/17 FILED.

CIVIL DEPOSIT FOR PAYMENT OF J

CIVIL DEPOSIT FOR PAYMENT OF JURY FEES BY PLTF

MINUTES/RE: STIPULATION TO CHA

MINUTES/RE: STIPULATION TO CHANGE OF VENUE FROM LA COURT TO RIVERSIDE COURT

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER SE

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER SENT TO SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC FILED

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER SE

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER SENT TO FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP FILED

RECEIPT FOR PAPERS RE: CHANGE

RECEIPT FOR PAPERS RE: CHANGE OF VENUE/TRANSFER FILED

CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE HISTORY

CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE HISTORY FROM LA SUPERIOR COURT FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SANQUAN KEATON

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY SANQUAN KEATON FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY SANQUAN KEATON.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 11/27/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 04.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY SANQUAN KEATON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY SANQUAN KEATON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY SANQUAN KEATON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SANQUAN KEATON

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE FROM SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE COUNTY OF LA TO THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2017 OF SANQUAN KEATON AS TO MIKE W.B.; MAILING DATE OF 05/03/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2017 OF SANQUAN KEATON AS TO JEFF MCGRAND; MAILING DATE OF 05/09/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2017 OF SANQUAN KEATON SERVED ON STEVE P RADOS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/21/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT TO SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/07/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2017 OF SANQUAN KEATON AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK - TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less