This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/26/2018 at 03:56:42 (UTC).

KARL MARX VS PALM DESERT DENTAL CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2007 KARL MARX filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PALM DESERT DENTAL CENTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9040

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

DARRYL MORRIS

MICHAEL TYLER

CAROLYN G GHAZAL DENTAL CORPORATION

JAMES CECCHINI DENTAL GROUP

JAMES CECCHINI DDSPHD

PARISH DENTAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BLESSEY, TAYLOR

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH T KUTYLA

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX BY JAMES CECCHINI DDSPHD, JAMES CECCHINI DENTAL GROUP REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY JAMES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY JAMES CECCHINI DDSPHD, JAMES CECCHINI DENTAL GROUP FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX SERVED ON DESERT CROSSING DENTAL GROUP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/10/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGE

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE OF SUMMONS COMPLAINT AS TO JAMES CECCHINI

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX SERVED ON JAMES CECCHINI DENTAL GROUP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/10/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX BY DESERT CROSSING DENTAL GROUP REPRESENTED BY CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN &MCKENNA FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX SERVED ON DARRYL MORRIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/24/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX SERVED ON MICHAEL TYLER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/28/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX BY MICHAEL TYLER REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH T KUTYLA FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX BY DARRYL MORRIS REPRESENTED BY TAYLOR BLESSEY FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DARRY

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DARRYL MORRIS FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING AD

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS BY DESERT CROSSING DENTAL GROUP FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KARL MARX, ELIZABETH MARX

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DARRYL MORRIS

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/07/2009

DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2008

DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2008
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2008

DocketJURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2008
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX AS TO DEFENDANT DESERT CROSSING DENTAL GROUP FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2008
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ENTIRE CASE (UNCONDITIONAL) PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) FILED. [FORM CM 200]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2008
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRIAL EVIDENCE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2008
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC DENTAL SERVICES, CAROLYN G. GHAZAL DENTAL CORPORATION, PARISH DENTAL CORPORATION FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2008

DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING - NOTICED; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2008

DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING - NOTICED; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
09/10/2007

DocketPOS-IMAGED-PRTY WAS ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PD DENTAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2007
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY JAMES CECCHINI DDSPHD, JAMES CECCHINI DENTAL GROUP FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2007
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2007 OF KARL MARX BY JAMES CECCHINI DDSPHD, JAMES CECCHINI DENTAL GROUP REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2007

DocketJAMES CECCHINI DENTAL GROUP ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PALM DESERT DENTALCENTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2007

DocketJAMES CECCHINI DDSPHD ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS JAMES CECCHINI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2007

DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: ANSWER SUBMITTED BY PALM DESERT DENTALCENTER, JAMES CECCHINI.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2007
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2007
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2007
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2007
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less