This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/20/2019 at 00:33:35 (UTC).

KAMOUIE VS THE FIRST TEE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 KAMOUIE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE FIRST TEE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7878

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Minors and Cross Defendants

ATOUSA SARINA KAMOUIE

ABBASS KAMOUIE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF PALM DESERT

CITY OF INDIO

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

THE FIRST TEE- COACHELLA VALLEY

DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER J AMENDT

363 South Park Ave Suite 300

Pomona, CA 91766

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GIBBS & FUERST LLP

600 B Street Suite 2300

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/28/2019 OF DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT FILED WITH PREJUDICE

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE M

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONF & OSC ON 8/14/19

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR DES

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT IN RESP TO COURTS OSC HEARING SET FOR 9/18/19 FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE AS TO THE FIRST TEE- COACHELLA VALLEY FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY OF INDIO, CITY OF PALM DESERT FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE AS TO DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT; MAILING DATE OF 04/24/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE SERVED ON CITY OF INDIO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/24/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/24/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE BY DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT REPRESENTED BY GIBBS & FUERST LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DESERT RECR

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT REPRESENTED BY GIBBS & FUERST LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/28/2019 OF DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT AND FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ATOUSA SARINA KAMOUIE

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO ORDER

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 5/22/19

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE M

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 6/21/19

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE AND FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF ATOUSA SARINA KAMOUIE NAMED AS ABBASS KAMOUIE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T LATTING.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2018 OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE AND FILED.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT/GIBBS & FUERST LLP IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF ALL XDEF SERVED/NO APPEARANCE.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/28/2019 OF DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DESERT RECREATION DISTRICT/GIBBS & FUERST LLP IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF ALL XDEF SERVED/NO APPEARANCE.; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • ATOUSA SARINA KAMOUIE/LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER J AMENDT IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF ALL DEFS SERVED/NO RESPONSE.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONF & OSCS SET 9/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION SUBMITTED BY ATOUSA SARINA KAMOUIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY DEF DESERT RECREATION

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 02/19/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2018 OF ATOUSA KAMOUIE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF ATOUSA SARINA KAMOUIE NAMED AS ABBASS KAMOUIE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T LATTING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/19/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less