This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 01:37:46 (UTC).

KAMJOO VS YOUNESI DDS INC; ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2012 KAMJOO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YOUNESI DDS INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2011

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

HOTAN D KAMJOO

Defendants and Appellants

H YOUNESI DDS INC

CAMILLE MOORE

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED (INDIO)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO AS TO H YOUNESI DDS INC SUB-SERVED JANE DOE (REFUSED NAME); MAILING DATE OF 10/04/12 FILED. COST OF $65.00

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO AS TO H YOUNESI DDS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/04/12.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO AS TO CAMILLE MOORE SUB-SERVED ERICKA ZONCA/PERSON IN CHARGE; MAILING DATE OF 10/04/12 FILED. COST OF $27.00

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO SERVED ON H YOUNESI DDS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/04/12 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $50.00.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON SMALL CLA

NOTICE OF HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MI

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MINUTE ORDER.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT

SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER, SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED 11/16/2012 OF H YOUNESI DDS INC FILED BY CAMILLE MOORE. (SC-105 PAGE 1 OF 2)

REQUEST BY H YOUNESI DDS INC T

REQUEST BY H YOUNESI DDS INC TO PAY JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $1285.39 TO THE COURT FOR DISBURSEMENT TO HOTAN D KAMJOO.

SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST

SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO FILED BY CAMILLE MOORE; HONORABLE JUDGE B J BJORK. (SC-105A)

SMALL CLAIMS - JUDGMENT CREDIT

SMALL CLAIMS - JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S HOTAN D KAMJOO REQUEST FOR FUNDS.

SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT

SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER, PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO FILED BY H YOUNESI DDS INC, CAMILLE MOORE. (SC-105 PAGE 1 OF 2)

SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST

SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO FILED BY H YOUNESI DDS INC; HONORABLE JUDGE B J BJORK. (SC-105A)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketD#1003461999 8/20/13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketTRUST EXONERATE-POSTED INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketTRUST EXONERATION - INTEREST BEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketCK#3320080665 $1286.69 6/26/14 SENT TO HAMID YOUNESI DDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketTRUST DEPOSIT - POSTED INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, H YOUNESI DDS INC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: MINUTE ORDER RE RELEASE OF FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: RELEASE OF FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH THE COURT TO THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY FULLY SATISFIED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S HOTAN D KAMJOO REQUEST FOR FUNDS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2012
  • DocketRULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 11/06/12 RE: SMALL CLAIMS; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING INDIO; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO SERVED ON H YOUNESI DDS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/04/12 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $50.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO AS TO CAMILLE MOORE SUB-SERVED ERICKA ZONCA/PERSON IN CHARGE; MAILING DATE OF 10/04/12 FILED. COST OF $27.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO AS TO H YOUNESI DDS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/04/12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 09/21/2012 OF HOTAN KAMJOO AS TO H YOUNESI DDS INC SUB-SERVED JANE DOE (REFUSED NAME); MAILING DATE OF 10/04/12 FILED. COST OF $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 11/06/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 1C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 1C (INDIO).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • DocketACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (INDIO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED (INDIO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less