This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/13/2018 at 03:41:36 (UTC).

Juror: Marcus Harvey

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 a Other case was filed by Juror Marcus Harvey in the jurisdiction of Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Juvenile Courthouse located in Riverside, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0004

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Undetermined

Marcus Lee Harvey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • JUROR SANCTIONS - CLERK'S CALENDAR; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • JUROR SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON 12/15/17 IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 PAID BY MARCUS LEE HARVEY (1ST VIOLATION NOT TO EXCEED $250.00).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JUROR CONTEMPT; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE JURY SERVICE, JUROR ASSIGNED TO A JURY SELECTION PROCESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • OSC SET 12/15/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT RIVJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • ORIGINAL JURY SUMMONS SENT WITH APPEARANCE DATE OF 05/08/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR LETTER SENT WITH APPEARANCE DATE OF 06/21/17 (JURY SERVICE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • JUROR COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • JUROR ACTIVITY HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • JURY BADGE NUMBER: 20798788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT RIVJ (JUROR).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • JUROR HISTORY INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less