This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 06:51:31 (UTC).

Juror: Jamie Lara

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 a Other case was filed by Juror Jamie Lara in the jurisdiction of Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Juvenile Courthouse located in Riverside, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0005

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Undetermined

Jamie Lara

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • JUROR SANCTIONS - CLERK'S CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • JUROR SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON 12/15/17 IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 PAID BY JAMIE LARA (1ST VIOLATION NOT TO EXCEED $250.00).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JUROR CONTEMPT; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE JURY SERVICE, JUROR ASSIGNED TO A JURY SELECTION PROCESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • OSC SET 12/15/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT RIVJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • JUROR COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • JUROR ACTIVITY HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • JURY BADGE NUMBER: 21324386

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • ORIGINAL JURY SUMMONS SENT WITH APPEARANCE DATE OF 10/23/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • JUROR HISTORY INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT RIVJ (JUROR).

    Read MoreRead Less