This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2018 at 15:13:06 (UTC).

JTF ROSE INC VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/07/2010 JTF ROSE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JTF ROSE INC

Defendant

VICTOR HERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIB

NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (BANNING)

AUTHORIZATION FOR WESLEY ROSE

AUTHORIZATION FOR WESLEY ROSE TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY JTF ROSE INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 01/07/2010 OF JTF ROSE INC AS TO VICTOR HERNANDEZ, MAILING DATE OF 02/03/10 FILED. COSTS OF $0.00.

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAI

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY VICTOR HERNANDEZ FILED

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE S

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY VICTOR HERNANDEZ IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER THOMAS S. HUDSPETH FILED.

ORIGINAL CIVIL SUBPOENA FILED

ORIGINAL CIVIL SUBPOENA FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO KIM WILLIMAS, SERVED ON DATE OF 03/11/10.

EXHIBIT LIST

EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT B1.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 10/01/18 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. RIEXH.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT B1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - BANNING; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL CIVIL SUBPOENA FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO KIM WILLIMAS, SERVED ON DATE OF 03/11/10.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS CIVIL SUBPOENA ISSUED AS TO KIM WILLIAMS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 3/15/10, AT 13:30, IN B1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY VICTOR HERNANDEZ IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER THOMAS S. HUDSPETH FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY VICTOR HERNANDEZ FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 01/07/2010 OF JTF ROSE INC AS TO VICTOR HERNANDEZ, MAILING DATE OF 02/03/10 FILED. COSTS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR WESLEY ROSE TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY JTF ROSE INC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (BANNING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 2/22/10, AT 13:30, IN B1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (BANNING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less