This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 12:15:07 (UTC).

JPMCC V SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 03/13/2014 JPMCC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0552

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS

Defendants

JENNIFER SANCHEZ

Temecula, CA 92591

VERONICA FAULKNER

Temecula, CA 92591

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Rd

Irvine, CA 92620

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS BY JENNIFER SANCHEZ, VERONICA FAULKNER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JENNIFER SANCHEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY VERONICA FAULKNER IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS SERVED ON VERONICA FAULKNER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/15/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS SERVED ON JENNIFER SANCHEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/15/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONOR

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS .

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 04/11/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 04/11/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - TEMECULA.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL AS TO VERONICA FAULKNER; REASON RETURNED: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 4/11/14, AT 8:00, IN DEPT T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY VERONICA FAULKNER (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JENNIFER SANCHEZ (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF JPMCC 2006-LDP7 SOLANA WAY LIMITED PARTNERS BY JENNIFER SANCHEZ, VERONICA FAULKNER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 5/16/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less