Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 08:42:06 (UTC).

JORGE E LARRONDO DDS VS NUNLEY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 JORGE E LARRONDO DDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NUNLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0153

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORGE E LARRONDO DDS

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant

JAMES NUNLEY

San Jacinto, CA 92582

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 03/21/2017 OF JORGE E LARRONDO DDS RESET FILED.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - UNDER $150

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - UNDER $1500 FILED. (HEMET)

DECLARATION OF ALEX LARRANDO F

DECLARATION OF ALEX LARRANDO FILED

NOTICE OF RE-SET SMALL CLAIMS

NOTICE OF RE-SET SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ORIGINALLY SET FOR 05/12/17 HAS BEEN RE-SET TO 06/23/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPT. H1 REQUESTED BY JORGE E LARRONDO DDS.

DECLARATION OF REQUEST TO CONT

DECLARATION OF REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DUE TO NON SERVICE FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING W/MINUTE ORDER.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING W/MINUTE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - HEMET; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ALEX LARRANDO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 03/21/2017 OF JORGE E LARRONDO DDS RESET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - HEMET; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - HEMET; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RE-SET SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ORIGINALLY SET FOR 05/12/17 HAS BEEN RE-SET TO 06/23/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPT. H1 REQUESTED BY JORGE E LARRONDO DDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DUE TO NON SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET FOR 5/15/17, AT 13:30, IN DEPT. H1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT H1. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - UNDER $1500 FILED. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less