This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 11:27:44 (UTC).

JOHNSON VS ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2005 JOHNSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ORTEGA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3177

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JILL JOHNSON

Defendant

ENRIQUE ORTEGA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SE

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2005 OF JILL JOHNSON AS TO ENRIQUE ORTEGA

SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE O

SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2005 OF JILL JOHNSON ON ENRIQUE ORTEGA SERVICE DATE OF 07/08/05 (PERSONALLY SERVED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2006
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER CLERKS JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION - JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2005 OF JILL JOHNSON AS TO ENRIQUE ORTEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2005 OF JILL JOHNSON AS TO ENRIQUE ORTEGA (SINGLE DEFENDANT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2005 OF JILL JOHNSON ON ENRIQUE ORTEGA SERVICE DATE OF 07/08/05 (PERSONALLY SERVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • DocketFEE PAID BY JILL JOHNSON FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/22/05 AT 10:00 IN 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less