Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/02/2021 at 22:26:07 (UTC).

JIMENEZ vs 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 JIMENEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3970

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORGE JIMENEZ

Defendant

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOON & YANG APC

Attorney at MOON & YANG APC

1055 West Seventh St. Suite 1880

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Joint Stipulation to Submit plaintiff's claims to binding arbitration

12/16/2020: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Joint Stipulation to Submit plaintiff's claims to binding arbitration

Joint Stipulation to submit plaintiff's claims to binding arbitration and stay action; order

12/16/2020: Joint Stipulation to submit plaintiff's claims to binding arbitration and stay action; order

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of JIMENEZ as to 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC; mailing date of 10/15/20 filed.

10/22/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of JIMENEZ as to 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC; mailing date of 10/15/20 filed.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

10/08/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

10/05/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint of JIMENEZ and filed.

10/05/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of JIMENEZ and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

10/05/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

10/05/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re: Joint Stipulation to Submit plaintiff's claims to binding arbitration; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Joint Stipulation to Submit plaintiff's claims to binding arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Joint Stipulation to submit plaintiff's claims to binding arbitration and stay action; order; Filed By: 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/03/2020; Fine Description: Check #47812 Receipt No.: 20201203-00135.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Requests not requiring a hearing in family law matter: continuance of hearing or case management conference; stipulation and order (GC70677C); Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/03/2020; Fine Description: Check #47812 Receipt No.: 20201203-00140.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION; PROPOSED ORDER; Filed By: 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of JIMENEZ as to 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC; mailing date of 10/15/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/08/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #3909 Receipt No.: CV201008-0099-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of JIMENEZ and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of JORGE JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant