Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 18:52:59 (UTC).

JASTILLANA VS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 09/22/2015 JASTILLANA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0326

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IMELDA C JASTILLANA

Eastvale, CA 92880

JULIO G JASTILLANA

Eastvale, CA 92880

Defendants

JOWIE RAMIREZ

Beaumont, CA 92223

JUAN FRANCISCO GOMEZ

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2015 OF JULIO JASTILLANA SERVED ON JOWIE RAMIREZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/22/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMURRER TO THE UNLAWFUL DETAI

DEMURRER TO THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2015 OF JULIO JASTILLANA FILED BY JOWIE RAMIREZ REPRESENTED BY (BANNING)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2015 OF JULIO JASTILLANA AS TO JUAN FRANCISCO GOMEZ; MAILING DATE OF 10/05/15 FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2015 OF JULIO JASTILLANA BY JOWIE RAMIREZ (BANNING); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2015 OF JULIO JASTILLANA AS TO JUAN FRANCISCO GOMEZ; MAILING DATE OF 10/05/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 10/28/15 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2015 OF JULIO JASTILLANA FILED BY JOWIE RAMIREZ REPRESENTED BY (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2015 OF JULIO JASTILLANA SERVED ON JOWIE RAMIREZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/22/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 11/23/15 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less