This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 21:21:57 (UTC).

INMAN VS FARIAS

Case Summary

On 11/08/2016 INMAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FARIAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1984

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANIS INMAN

Defendant

JOEL FARIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HARRISON

11330 Pierce St

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JANIS INMAN.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 11/18/16

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF JANIS INMAN AS TO JOEL FARIAS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF JANIS INMAN SERVED ON JOEL FARIAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/11/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF JANIS INMAN AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JANIS INMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 11/18/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF JANIS INMAN AS TO JOEL FARIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT CLERKS JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY JANIS INMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • FAX FILING BY JANIS INMAN ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF JANIS INMAN SERVED ON JOEL FARIAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/11/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 1/09/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF JANIS INMAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less