Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/25/2019 at 07:37:32 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF PHILIAN EUGENE LEE

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 IN THE MATTER OF PHILIAN EUGENE LEE was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1311

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHILIAN EUGENE LEE

Respondents

KAMALA D HARRIS

San Diego, CA 92101

ON HABEAS CORPUS

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA

Interested Parties

FOR RESPONDENTS

DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF COUNTY OFRIVERSIDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

PETERMANN, CONRAD

323 East Matilijs St Ste 11 Pmb 142

Ojai, CA 93023

SCHLESINGER, JOSEPH

101 Second St Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94105

ENTER, HABEAS CORPU S RESOURCE C

303 Second St Suite 400 South

San Francisco, CA 94107

HABEAS CORPUS RESOURCE CENTER

303 Second St Suite 400 South

San Francisco, CA 94107

Respondent Attorneys

HARRIS, KAMALA D.

110 West A Street, Ste. 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

ATTORNEY GENERAL -SAN DIEGO

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800 Po Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92101

Interested Party Attorneys

CAVALIER, COLLETTE C

600 West Broadway Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY -RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

TRAVERSE TO THE RETURN TO ORDE

TRAVERSE TO THE RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

FILED: CORRESPONDENCE FROM HAB

FILED: CORRESPONDENCE FROM HABEAS CORPUS RESOURCE CTR

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - EXTENSION OF TIME ENTERED ON 07/25/19 FILED.

ORDER FOR EXTENSON OF TIME IS

ORDER FOR EXTENSON OF TIME IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE BERNARD J. SCHWARTZ.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - GRANTED ENTERED ON 05/14/19 FILED.

RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR EXTENS

RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FORMAL RETURN TO PETITION FOR WRIT

FILED: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:

FILED: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ORDER-PETITION FOR WRIT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ENTERED ON 03/29/19 FILED.

ORDER FROM SUPERME COURT VACAT

ORDER FROM SUPERME COURT VACATING APPOINTMENT OF CAP AND APPOINTING HCRC-JUSTICE CANTIL-SAKAUYE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ENTERED ON 12/17/18 FILED.

ORDER FOR EXTENSION IS GRANTED

ORDER FOR EXTENSION IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE BERNARD J. SCHWARTZ.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO D

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 44 (WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS)

INFORMAL RESPONSE TO HABEAS CO

INFORMAL RESPONSE TO HABEAS CORPUS FILED 10/16/2018 OF PHILIAN LEE FILED BY KAMALA D HARRIS (HABEAS CORPUS).

REPLY TO INFORMAL RESPONSE BY

REPLY TO INFORMAL RESPONSE BY KAMALA D HARRIS FILED BY PHILIAN EUGENE LEE (HABEAS CORPUS).

EXHIBITS ACCOMPANYING THE PETI

EXHIBITS ACCOMPANYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS VOLUME ONE PAGES 1 - 662

EXH IN SUP OF REPLY TO INFORMA

EXH IN SUP OF REPLY TO INFORMAL RESPONSE & PET FOR WRIT VOLUME 4 PAGES 1820 - 2180

PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CO

PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

PEOPLES INFORMAL RESPONSE TO S

PEOPLES INFORMAL RESPONSE TO SHELL PETITION

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • HEARING RE: COURT RULING ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • HEARING RE: ATKINS ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • HR HEARING SET FOR 10/11/19 AT 08:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: TRAVERS/DENIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRAVERSE TO THE RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • HEARING RE: DENIAL TO WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • HEARING RE: COURT RULING ON PETITION; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • HEARING RE: ATKINS ISSUE; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: CORRESPONDENCE FROM HABEAS CORPUS RESOURCE CTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • HEARING RE: DENIAL TO WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - EXTENSION OF TIME ENTERED ON 07/25/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO HONORABLE JUDGE BURKE E STRUNSKY IN DEPARTMENT 260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS ACCOMPANYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS VOLUME TWO PAGES 663 - 1274

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EXH IN SUP OF REPLY TO INFORMAL RESPONSE & PET FOR WRIT VOLUME 4 PAGES 1820 - 2180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS ACCOMPANYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS VOLUME THREE PAGES 1275 - 1819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS ACCOMPANYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS VOLUME ONE PAGES 1 - 662

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO INFORMAL RESPONSE BY ATTORNEY GENERAL OFCALIFORNIA FILED BY PHILIAN EUGENE LEE (HABEAS CORPUS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • INFORMAL RESPONSE TO HABEAS CORPUS FILED 10/16/2018 OF PHILIAN LEE FILED BY ATTORNEY GENERAL OFCALIFORNIA (HABEAS CORPUS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO HONORABLE JUDGE BERNARD J. SCHWARTZ IN DEPARTMENT 44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ON HABEAS CORPUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAVALIER, COLLETTE C