This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/29/2020 at 23:04:08 (UTC).

In the Matter of Gregory Allen Meeks

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 In the Matter of Gregory Allen Meeks was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3952

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEVEN R MEEKS

5900 La Place Court Ste. 105

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

MEMORANDUM ISO PETITION FOR CE

MEMORANDUM ISO PETITION FOR CERTIFICATE OF REHABILITATION AND PARDON FILED

DECLARATION OF GREGORY ALLEN M

DECLARATION OF GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS ISO PETITION FOR CERTIFICATE OF REHABILITATION AND PARDON FILED

NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION F

NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR CERTIFICATE OF REHABILITATION AND PARDON BY GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS FILED.

PETITION FOR REHABILITATION AN

PETITION FOR REHABILITATION AND PARDON FILED

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketHEARING RE: REHABILITATION AND PARDON; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM ISO PETITION FOR CERTIFICATE OF REHABILITATION AND PARDON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS ISO PETITION FOR CERTIFICATE OF REHABILITATION AND PARDON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: NTC OF FILING PET FOR CERT OF REHAB AND PARDON SUBMITTED BY GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR CERTIFICATE OF REHABILITATION AND PARDON BY GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY GREGORY ALLEN MEEKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REHABILITATION AND PARDON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketHEARING RE REHABILITATION AND PARDON SET FOR 9/05/19 AT 13:30 IN DEPT 64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketPETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEEKS STEVEN R.