This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/08/2020 at 00:31:01 (UTC).

In The Matter of Billy Ray Riggs

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 In The Matter of Billy Ray Riggs was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1227

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ROSE D ANGULO

Santa Ana, CA 92701

BILLY RAY RIGGS

SEAN K KENNEDY

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4202

MARGARET FARRAND

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4202

Respondent

ON HABEAS CORPUS

Interested Party

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Riverside, CA 92501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ANGULO, ROSE D

411 West Fourth St Suite 7110

Santa Ana, CA 92701

PETERSON, SAIDANDANA

321 East 2Nd Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4202

MILLMAN, MICHAEL G

101 Second Street 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

HILARY POTASHNER

321 East 2Nd Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

CROUCHLEY, JOHN

321 East 2Nd Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4202

LINDSEY, JELANI J

321 East 2Nd St

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4202

KENNEDY, SEAN K

321 East 2Nd Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4202

FARRAND, MARGARET

321 East 2Nd Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4202

Interested Party Attorney

OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY -RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRI

FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WR

SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CO

PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

INFORMAL RESPONSE TO SECOND AM

INFORMAL RESPONSE TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY ATTORNEY GENERAL

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF FIRST A

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS VOL 1 OF 3

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF FIRST A

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS VOL 2 OF 3

CLAIM 3 TO SECOND AMENDED PETI

CLAIM 3 TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

TIMELESS SUBSECTION E TO SECON

TIMELESS SUBSECTION E TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF 1ST AME

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF 1ST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS VOL 3 OF 3

EXHIBITS 60 61 62 63 64 68 77

EXHIBITS 60 61 62 63 64 68 77 & 81 IN SUPPORT OF 2ND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS

EXHIBITS 64 66 67 69 70 71 72

EXHIBITS 64 66 67 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 78 79 & 80 IN SUP OF PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

EXHIBTIS 82 83 84 & 85 IN SUP

EXHIBTIS 82 83 84 & 85 IN SUP OF 2ND AMENDED PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS & INFORMAL REPLY

PETITIONERS INFORMAL REPLY

PETITIONERS INFORMAL REPLY

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO D

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G (WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REASS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL BY BILLY RAY RIGGS FILED.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COU

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL BY DISTRICT ATTORNEY FILED.

FILED: PETITIONERS STATUS CONF

FILED: PETITIONERS STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT;EXH A & B

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGEMENT LODGED BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: PETITIONERS STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT;EXH A & B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketON HABEAS CORPUS FILED 10/16/2018 OF BILLY RIGGS AS TO BILLY RAY RIGGS ATTORNEY HILARY POTASHNER ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketON HABEAS CORPUS FILED 10/16/2018 OF BILLY RIGGS AS TO BILLY RAY RIGGS ATTORNEY SAIDANDANA PETERSON ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketON HABEAS CORPUS FILED 10/16/2018 OF BILLY RIGGS AS TO BILLY RAY RIGGS ATTORNEY JOHN CROUCHLEY ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCHANGE ATTORNEY ON BILLY RAY RIGGS FROM HILARY POTASHNER TO JELANI J LINDSEY ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketREMOVE FROM THE HABEAS CORPUS FILED 10/16/2018 OF BILLY RIGGS THE FOLLOWING PARTY(S) ROSE D ANGULO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketREMOVE FROM THE HABEAS CORPUS FILED 10/16/2018 OF BILLY RIGGS THE FOLLOWING PARTY(S) MARGARET FARRAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCHANGE ATTORNEY ON MARGARET FARRAND FROM JOHN CROUCHLEY TO JELANI J LINDSEY ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketREMOVE FROM THE HABEAS CORPUS FILED 10/16/2018 OF BILLY RIGGS THE FOLLOWING PARTY(S) SEAN K KENNEDY, MARGARET FARRAND, ROSE D ANGULO

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketWRIT REVIEW CALENDAR SET 11/30/18 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CCW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT SJ1 - WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO HONORABLE JUDGE SEAN P. LAFFERTY IN DEPARTMENT SJ1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS 60 61 62 63 64 68 77 & 81 IN SUPPORT OF 2ND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS 64 66 67 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 78 79 & 80 IN SUP OF PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBTIS 82 83 84 & 85 IN SUP OF 2ND AMENDED PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS & INFORMAL REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONERS INFORMAL REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDOCUMENT: EXHS 77 IN SUP OF 2ND AMND PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS ORDERED SEALED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDOCUMENT: CLAIM 8 TO 2ND AMNDED PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPU ORDERED SEALED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ON HABEAS CORPUS is a litigant