This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/08/2018 at 23:56:23 (UTC).

IGLESIAS VS GRILL CONCEPTS

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 IGLESIAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GRILL CONCEPTS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5475

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILMA IGLESIAS

Defendant

GRILL CONCEPTS INCA CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MARIO A PALENCIAAPC

44250 Monroe Street

Indio, CA 92201

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUE HEARING RE STATUS OF ARBITRATION IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: AMENDED O

NOTICE OF RULING RE: AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS REQ FOR JU

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS REQ FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL ARB & DISM/STAY ACTION BY VILMA IGLESIAS FILED

DECLARATION OF VILMA IGLESIAS

DECLARATION OF VILMA IGLESIAS IN SUPPORT OF PLFFS OPPO TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARB & DISM/STAY ACTION FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION BY VILMA IGLESIAS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OP

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OPPOS/OBEJECTIONS/DEC ON LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGARD & SMITH WITH A MAILING DATE OF 01/08/18 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PLFFS OPPOS & NTC IN SUPP OF DEMURRER ON LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGARD & SMITH WITH A MAILING DATE OF 01/08/18 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

REPLY TO PLTF UNTIMELY OPPO TO

REPLY TO PLTF UNTIMELY OPPO TO DEF DEMURRER BY GRILL CONCEPTS INCA CALIFORNIA FILED

FILED: HARWIN DECL I/S OF DEFS

FILED: HARWIN DECL I/S OF DEFS REPLY TO UNTIMELY OPPO

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2017 OF VILMA IGLESIAS BY GRILL CONCEPTS INCA CALIFORNIA REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGARD & SMITH FILED.

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATI

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION BY GRILL CONCEPTS INCA CALIFORNIA FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY GRILL CONCEPTS INCA CALIFORNIA.

DECLARATION OF (GEHRKE)/IN SUP

DECLARATION OF (GEHRKE)/IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION FILED

DECLARATION OF (HARWIN)/IN SUP

DECLARATION OF (HARWIN)/IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION FILED

DECLARATION OF (REGALADO)/IN S

DECLARATION OF (REGALADO)/IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION FILED

DECLARATION OF (SOTO)/IN SUPPO

DECLARATION OF (SOTO)/IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION FILED

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY VILMA IGLESIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUE HEARING RE STATUS OF ARBITRATION IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY GRILL CONCEPTS INCA CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (AMENDED) GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS/STAY ACTION; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF GRILL CONCEPTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2017 OF VILMA IGLESIAS SERVED ON GRILL CONCEPTS INCA CALIFORNIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/10/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2017 OF VILMA IGLESIAS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY VILMA IGLESIAS (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY VILMA IGLESIAS IS GRANTED; CLERK MALLEN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FOR VILMA IGLESIAS WAS GRANTED FOR 1ST PAPER FEE; $450.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 12/05/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less