Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/22/2017 at 06:41:26 (UTC).

IBRHIM VS ACOSTA INVESTMENTS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 IBRHIM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACOSTA INVESTMENTS LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5005

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAGUI IBRAHIM

SANDRA IBRAHIM

Defendants

THE MORTGAGE CORNER INC

ASCOSTA INVESTMENTS LLC

ARBOR ONE ESCROW INC

LORIE HOWER

KHALIL FAYEZ IBRAHIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUMENSTEIN LAW

4343 Von Karman Ave Ste 150

New Port Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

THE MELLOR LAW FIRM

6800 Indiana Ave Suite 220

Riverside, CA 92506

MANNING & KASS,ELLROD,RAMIREZ,TRESTER LLP

801 South Figueroa Street 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FIL

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF NAGUI IBRAHIM FILED BY ARBOR ONE ESCROW INC REPRESENTED BY MANNING & KASS,ELLROD,RAMIREZ,TRESTER LLP. (OVER $25,000)

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR / TO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR / TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AGAINST ACOSTA INVESTMENTS IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN P. FARRELL.

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FIL

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF NAGUI IBRAHIM FILED BY THE MORTGAGE CORNERINC, KHALIL FAYEZ IBRAHIM REPRESENTED BY THE MELLOR LAW FIRM. (OVER $25,000)

ORDER ON DEFT ARBOR ONE ESCROW

ORDER ON DEFT ARBOR ONE ESCROW INC.S NTC OF MTN & MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN P. FARRELL.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEMURRER, SUPPORTING DECLARATION, MTN TO STRIKE ON BLUMENSTEIN LAW WITH A MAILING DATE OF 05/05/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY N

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY NAGUI IBRAHIM, SANDRA IBRAHIM FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 1

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 11/13/17 HEARING(S)

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF NAGUI IBRAHIM BY THE MORTGAGE CORNERINC, KHALIL FAYEZ IBRAHIM REPRESENTED BY THE MELLOR LAW FIRM FILED. (OVER $25,000)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUING 09/18

MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUING 09/18/17 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF NAGUI IBRAHIM SERVED ON LORIE HOWER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/30/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF NAGUI IBRAHIM AS TO ASCOSTA INVESTMENTSLLC; MAILING DATE OF 03/25/17 FILED.

JUDGMENT ON THE 1ST AMENDED CO

JUDGMENT ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NAGUI IBRAHIM FILED ; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF NAGUI IBRAHIM AS TO ASCOSTA INVESTMENTSLLC FILED.

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NAGUI

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NAGUI IBRAHIM FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR EN

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BASED UPON WRITTEN STIPULATION BY NAGUI IBRAHIM, SANDRA IBRAHIM FILED

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OR SALE ISSUED AS TO RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL.; Disposition: GRANTED IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY IBRAHIM FOR HEARING 12/01/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 12/01/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL BY NAGUI IBRAHIM, SANDRA IBRAHIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ANY PARTY NOT AT-ISSUE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 11/13/17 HEARING(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2017
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY KHALIL FAYEZ IBRAHIM (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 06/13/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 07 - RES67084.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY THE MORTGAGE CORNER INC (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • COURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY DEFENDANTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR DEMURRER ON 06/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF NAGUI IBRAHIM AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/22/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less