Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 21:52:08 (UTC).

HUTCHINSON VS. US HOME CORP

Case Summary

On 03/14/2008 HUTCHINSON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against US HOME CORP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5561

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIA TERESA LARIOS

GRAHAM HOLLIS

AUNG THU

SHERRY OTTO

MARIE COBO

JENNIFER WEBB

ROBERT SUNDSTROM

JOANIE SUNDSTROM

BEBBIE PRATTO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TWR ENTERPRISES INC

US HOME CORPORATION

LENNAR SALES COPRORATION

BLUE ROSE CONCRETECONTRACTORSINC

TRIUMPH SHEET METAL INC

COATE PLASTERING INC

PETERSEN-DEAN INC

BEAR ROOFING INC

EXECUTIVE PLUMBINGINC

WENDELL C BURSON

S.W. CONSTRUCTION INC

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

S.W. CONSTRUCTION INC

US HOME CORPORATION

LENNAR SALES COPRORATION

BLUE ROSE CONCRETECONTRACTORSINC

91 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASDAN SIMONDS RILEY & VAUGHANLLP

19900 Macarthur Blvd. Suite 850

Irvine, CA 92612-6510

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave #750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

GREEN & HALL LLP

1851 East First Street 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT, LLP

5720 Oberlin Dr.

San Diego, CA 92121-1723

THE LAW OFFICES OFPHILIP E. BLACK

28914 Roadside Dr. Suite E-4

Agoura Hills, CA 91301-4535

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & RYAN

3460 Wilshire Blvd 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90020-2228

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

17901 Von Karman Ave. Ste 300

Irvine, CA 92614-7235

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA LLP

20320 S.W. Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

KENNEDY & SOUZA APC

1230 Columbia Street Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

LETOFSKY, LARRY D

3655 Nobel Dr Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92122

POLLARD MAVREDAKISCRANERT CRAWFORD & STEVE

800 East Colorado Blvd. Suite 300

Pasadena, CA 91101

GARRETT A SMEE ESQ.

490 Corporate Dr

Escondido, CA 92029

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 Town Center Dr #1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

WEIL & DRAGE, APC

23212 Mill Creek Dr

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

LAW OFFICES OF MARK J SKAPIK

250 W. First St. Ste. 330

Claremont, CA 91711

BATRON PETRINI LLP

1320 Columbia Street Suite 210

San Diego, CA 92101

MCMAHON LAW FIRM INC

980 Montecito Drive Ste 280

Corona, CA 92879

HAMMONS & BALDINO

2601 Airport Dr #105

Torrance, CA 90505

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

21700 Copley Dr, Ste 310

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON BY US HOME CORPORATION, LENNAR SALES COPRORATION REPRESENTED BY GREEN & HALL LLP FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFT MOTI

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFT MOTION TO STRIKE PLA COMPLAINT BY US HOME CORPORATION, LENNAR SALES COPRORATION FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON BY MAYER ROOFING INC REPRESENTED BY GARRETT A SMEE ESQ. FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON AS TO A + CUSTOM SHEET METAL & SUPPLY FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON AS TO TUNSTILL PLASTERING FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON BY BLUE ROSE CONCRETECONTRACTORSINC REPRESENTED BY THE HUDSON FIRM FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING

STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED FILED BY A + CUSTOM SHEET METAL & SUPPLY

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HAROLD HUTCHISON BY PETERSEN-DEAN INC REPRESENTED BY THE LAW OFFICES OFPHILIP E. BLACK FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HAROLD HUTCHISON BY ROYCON INC REPRESENTED BY KENNEDY & SOUZA APC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HAROLD HUTCHISON SERVED ON WB CONTRACTORS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/18/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMP

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 03/02/09. CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN CARD SIGNED BY ALESA GIBBS.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION BY REGAL CULTURED MARBLE INC REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION SERVED ON CANAC KITCHENS LIMITED WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/27/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION AS TO GUTZMANN MASONRY INC; MAILING DATE OF 03/14/09 FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION BY WEST COAST INTERIORS INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION BY NEUGEBAUER & ASSOCIATES INC REPRESENTED BY MCMAHON LAW FIRM INC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF ORDER DETERMINING SE

NOTICE OF ORDER DETERMINING SETTLEMENT OF BE IN GOOD FAITH BY FCM FIREPLACES FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2011
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • DATE TO SET OSC FOR DESTRUCTION (DISMISSAL) IS SET 10/20/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. RIDST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2009 OF S.W. CONSTRUCTION INC SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 09/16/10.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • HSCDJ HEARING SET FOR 09/16/10 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: ALL COMPLAINTS DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2009 OF S.W. CONSTRUCTION INC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE:DISMISSAL BY S.W. CONSTRUCTION INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • OSC HEARING RE: PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT AS TO HAROLD HUTCHISON.; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
313 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2008
  • --ALSO AMENDING COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON NAMING DOES 102 TO BE BEAR ROOFING INC--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • --ALSO AMENDING COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON NAMING DOES 103 TO BE BLUE ROSE CONCRETECONTRACTORSINC--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON NAMING DOES 101 TO BE A + CUSTOM SHEET METAL & SUPPLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • NEW COMPLAINT FAX FILED BY KASDAN SIMONDS RILEY & VAUGHANLLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2008 OF HAROLD HUTCHISON AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/11/08 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.W. CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEAR ROOFING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COATE PLASTERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE ROSE CONCRETECONTRACTORS, INC is a litigant