This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 06:24:34 (UTC).

HUSEIN vs WHITLOCK

Case Summary

On 01/10/2014 HUSEIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WHITLOCK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0071

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMRAN HUSEIN

Menifee, CA 92584

Defendants

ASHELY WHITLOCK

Temecula, CA 92591

BRODY HARRELL

AMY WHITLOCK

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/10/2014 OF IMRAN HUSEIN SERVED ON ASHELY WHITLOCK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/12/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/10/2014 OF IMRAN HUSEIN SERVED ON BRODY HARRELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/12/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/10/2014 OF IMRAN HUSEIN AS TO AMY WHITLOCK; MAILING DATE OF 01/13/14 FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 01/29/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS JU

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/10/2014 OF IMRAN HUSEIN AS TO ASHELY WHITLOCK, AMY WHITLOCK, BRODY HARRELL (DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY IMRAN HUSEIN.

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AN

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY ASHELY WHITLOCK REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY ASHELY WHITLOCK FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ASHELY WHITLOCK IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON IMRAN HUSEIN WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/28/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF OSC HEARING.

CORRESPONDENCE FROM IMRAN HUSE

CORRESPONDENCE FROM IMRAN HUSEIN

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 10/10/14 T1 JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE).

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/10/14.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/10/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 10/10/14 T1 JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AS TO IMRAN HUSEIN, ASHELY WHITLOCK, AMY WHITLOCK, BRODY HARRELL.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE FROM IMRAN HUSEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF OSC HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/15/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/10/2014 OF IMRAN HUSEIN AS TO ASHELY WHITLOCK ATTORNEY PRO/PER ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY ASHELY WHITLOCK; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON IMRAN HUSEIN WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/28/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ASHELY WHITLOCK IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/10/2014 OF IMRAN HUSEIN AS TO AMY WHITLOCK; MAILING DATE OF 01/13/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/10/2014 OF IMRAN HUSEIN SERVED ON BRODY HARRELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/12/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/10/2014 OF IMRAN HUSEIN SERVED ON ASHELY WHITLOCK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/12/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/14/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less