Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 05:25:26 (UTC).

HUNGERFORD vs FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 HUNGERFORD filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M Chapman and David M. Chapman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8463

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M Chapman

David M. Chapman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANA HUNGERFORD

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC

CARLOS A GUTIERREZ SR

MARIANA GUTIERREZ

CARLOS GUTIERREZ JR

CARLOS GUTIERREZ, JR

CARLOS A GUTIERREZ, SR

CHARLIE GUTIERREZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CARLOS A GUTIERREZ SR

MARIANA GUTIERREZ

CARLOS GUTIERREZ JR

CARLOS GUTIERREZ, JR

CARLOS A GUTIERREZ, SR

CHARLIE GUTIERREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FERGUSON CASE ORR PATERSON & CUNNINGHAM

1050 South Kimball Road

Ventura, CA 93004

FERGUSON CASE ORR PATERSON LLP

Attorney at FERGUSON CASE ORR PATERSON LLP

1050 South Kimball Road

Ventura, CA 93004-2000

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SLOVAK BARON EMPEYMURPHY & PINKNEY

1800 East Tahquitz Cnyn Way

Palm Springs, CA 92262

SLOVAK BARON EMPEY MURPHY & PINKNEY

Attorney at SLOVAK BARON EMPEY MURPHY & PINKNEY

SOBERO LAW OFFICE

Attorney at SOBERO LAW OFFICE

78000 Fred Waring Dr #201

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SOBERO LAW OFFICE

Attorney at SOBERO LAW OFFICE

78000 Fred Waring Dr #201

Palm Desert, CA 92211

 

Court Documents

Peter J Nolan Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Mediation Completion Date

03/10/2021: Peter J Nolan Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Mediation Completion Date

Stipulation and Order re: Continuance of Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines is Denied; Honorable Judge David M Chapman

02/25/2021: Stipulation and Order re: Continuance of Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines is Denied; Honorable Judge David M Chapman

Answer to Cross Complaint of GUTIERREZ by FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC represented by SLOVAK BARON EMPEY MURPHY & PINKNEY filed. (Over $25,000.00)

10/30/2020: Answer to Cross Complaint of GUTIERREZ by FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC represented by SLOVAK BARON EMPEY MURPHY & PINKNEY filed. (Over $25,000.00)

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 10/29/20 at 8:30 in Department PS2.

10/15/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 10/29/20 at 8:30 in Department PS2.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Hearing on Right to Attach Order on 08/26/20 at 8:30 in Department PS2.

08/12/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Hearing on Right to Attach Order on 08/26/20 at 8:30 in Department PS2.

Case Management Statement filed by FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC

06/01/2020: Case Management Statement filed by FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC

Minute Order: Continuance of Hearing on Right to Attach Order/ Issuance of Writ of Attachment

04/17/2020: Minute Order: Continuance of Hearing on Right to Attach Order/ Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by CARLOS GUTIERREZ JR is Granted; Clerk A GARCIA (Granted) Form FW-003.

03/11/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by CARLOS GUTIERREZ JR is Granted; Clerk A GARCIA (Granted) Form FW-003.

Answer to Complaint of HUNGERFORD by CARLOS GUTIERREZ JR, CARLOS A GUTIERREZ SR, MARIANA GUTIERREZ represented by SOBERO LAW OFFICE filed. (Over $25,000.00)

03/11/2020: Answer to Complaint of HUNGERFORD by CARLOS GUTIERREZ JR, CARLOS A GUTIERREZ SR, MARIANA GUTIERREZ represented by SOBERO LAW OFFICE filed. (Over $25,000.00)

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of HUNGERFORD as to CARLOS A GUTIERREZ SR; mailing date of 02/12/20 filed.

02/19/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of HUNGERFORD as to CARLOS A GUTIERREZ SR; mailing date of 02/12/20 filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint of HUNGERFORD served on FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC with service date of 01/15/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of DIANA HUNGERFORD

01/23/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint of HUNGERFORD served on FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC with service date of 01/15/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of DIANA HUNGERFORD

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

11/20/2019: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingType: Court Trial - Long Cause; Judicial Officer: David M. Chapman; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingType: Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Mediation Completion Date: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Peter J Nolan in Support; Judicial Officer: David M. Chapman; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Mediation Completion Date: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Peter J Nolan in Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Ruling re: March 12, 2021 Ex Parte on Complaint of DIANA HUNGERFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Motion, application (including ex parte) or any other paper requiring a hearing subsequent to the first paper filing (70617A); Amount: $60.00; Paid: $60.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1003 Receipt No.: 20210311-00013.1; Paid: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1003 Receipt No.: 20210311-00013.1; Paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Mediation Completion Date: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Peter J Nolan in Support Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Mediation Completion Date on Complaint of DIANA HUNGERFORD; Filed By: FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Peter J Nolan Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Mediation Completion Date; Filed By: FIRESIDE LOUNGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: Continuing Mediation Completion Date on Complaint of DIANA HUNGERFORD; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation and Order re: Continuance of Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines is Denied; Honorable Judge David M Chapman; Filed By: DIANA HUNGERFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Motion, application (including ex parte) or any other paper requiring a hearing subsequent to the first paper filing (70617A); Amount: $60.00; Paid: $60.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/07/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #4817 Receipt No.: CV200107-0056-OR.1; Paid: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/07/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #4817 Receipt No.: CV200107-0057-OR.1; Paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/20/2019; Fine Description: Check #48439 Receipt No.: CV191120-0264-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92264.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of HUNGERFORD and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of DIANA HUNGERFORD

    Read MoreRead Less