This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/03/2018 at 08:03:22 (UTC).

HUDSON VS BEAN

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 HUDSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1419

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DAVID HUDSON

Wildomar, CA 92595

DEIDRE BEAN

Wildomar, CA 92595

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LISA J BEAVERS

Wildomar, CA 92595

RICKY L BEAVERS

Wildomar, CA 92595

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEM

SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 07/20/2017 OF DAVID HUDSON AS TO RICKY L BEAVERS, MAILING DATE OF 10/15/17 FILED. COSTS OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 07/20/2017 OF DAVID HUDSON SERVED ON LISA J BEAVERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/12/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER-MO

DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER-MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSON ONLY FILED BY RICKY L BEAVERS, LISA J BEAVERS.

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAI

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY RICKY L BEAVERS, LISA J BEAVERS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 10/27/2017 OF RICKY BEAVERS SERVED ON DAVID HUDSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/28/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 10/27/2017 OF RICKY BEAVERS SERVED ON DEIDRE BEAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/28/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE S

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY LISA J BEAVERS IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL ON PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S CLAIM.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL ON PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S CLAIMS SET 2/21/18 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY LISA J BEAVERS IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 10/27/2017 OF RICKY BEAVERS SERVED ON DEIDRE BEAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/28/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 10/27/2017 OF RICKY BEAVERS SERVED ON DAVID HUDSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/28/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY RICKY L BEAVERS, LISA J BEAVERS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER-MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSON ONLY FILED BY RICKY L BEAVERS, LISA J BEAVERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 07/20/2017 OF DAVID HUDSON SERVED ON LISA J BEAVERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/12/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 07/20/2017 OF DAVID HUDSON AS TO RICKY L BEAVERS, MAILING DATE OF 10/15/17 FILED. COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 11/01/17, AT 8:00, IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT S205. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less