This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/12/2018 at 06:27:37 (UTC).

HPG MANAGEMENT VS KRAFT

Case Summary

On 05/15/2003 HPG MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KRAFT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9793

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HPG MANAGEMENT

Defendant

ROGER KRAFT

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & ST. JOHN

7676 Hazard Ctr. Dr. #900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

FILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETA

FILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVE

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO ROGER KRAFT IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2003 OF HPG MANAGEMENT BY ROGER KRAFT REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAIN

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HPG MANAGEMENT

SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SUBSTITUT

SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2003 OF HPG MANAGEMENT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S); WITH MAILING DATE OF 05/18/03 FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM.

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART GLICKMAN.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING HPG MANAGEMENT. ADDRESS CHANGED FOR: KIMBALL TIREY & ST.JOHN FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL DATED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL DATED 7-10-03

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $25.0

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $25.00.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFA

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, ROGER KRAFT FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; RI

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, ROGER KRAFT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2004
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2004
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $274.98 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $93.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2004
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HPG MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • DocketAPPLICATION 5/22/03 FOR WAIVER OF FEES PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS FILED BY ROGER KRAFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2003 OF HPG MANAGEMENT BY ROGER KRAFT REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO ROGER KRAFT IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK.; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 7/14/03 AT 11:00 IN DEPT. C2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HPG MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant