This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 07:02:30 (UTC).

HOGGARD VS WALKER

Case Summary

On 01/09/2017 HOGGARD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WALKER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0030

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEJUAN HOGGARD

Defendants

DEVON WALKER

SHILA WALKER

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th St

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DEJUAN HOGGARD.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/15/17

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AS TO DEVON WALKER, SHILA WALKER, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 01/19/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SHILA WALKER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/19/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DEVON WALKER; AND MAILED ON 01/19/17 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DEJUAN HOGGARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AS TO DEVON WALKER, SHILA WALKER, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 01/19/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SHILA WALKER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/19/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DEVON WALKER; AND MAILED ON 01/19/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 3/10/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2017 OF DEJUAN HOGGARD AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less